Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242178

EP1242178 - INERT CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2008
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.03.2008  [2008/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / COCLOUGH Nicola
Alderley Park,Macclesfield
Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2006/12]
Former [2002/39]Phillips, Neil
AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Sodertalje / SE
Application number, filing date00979762.228.11.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000GB04525
Priority number, dateGB1999002837002.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9928370
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0139877
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242178
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/00, B01J20/26, G01N1/34
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INERTE TRÄGERMATERIALEN[2002/39]
English:INERT CARRIERS[2002/39]
French:PORTEURS INERTES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2002National basic fee paid 
02.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
29.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/10]
22.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4341005  (MAVRINA LJUBA DR RER NAT [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 2, line 34 - line 60 *;
 [X]US5002695  (SCHULZ PAUL [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 12 - line 14 * * column 2, line 17 - line 66 * * column 3, line 5 - line 11 *;
 [A]EP0182612  (PRISTROJE LAB N P [CS]) [A] 1,3-6,11,12 * page 3, line 9 - line 11 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * page 4 *;
 [PA]WO0006297  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1,3-6,10-13 * page 3, line 15 - line 26 * * page 5, line 5 - line 9 *;
 [A]GB2316941  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5751629  (NOVA MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] * column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 15 - line 16 * * column 8, line 21 - line 26 * * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 16 * * column 18, line 54 - line 55 * * column 20, line 50 - line 51 *