Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236222

EP1236222 - UNIVERSAL HARDWARE DEVICE AND METHOD AND TOOLS FOR USE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cellot Inc.
701 Renner Road
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / OFER, Meged
30 Geva Street
42384 Netanya / IL
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/36]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00979903.228.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000IL00797
Priority number, dateUS19990167684P29.11.1999         Original published format: US 167684 P
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0139249
Date:31.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1236222
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236222
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLE VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN UND WERKZEUGE ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG[2002/36]
English:UNIVERSAL HARDWARE DEVICE AND METHOD AND TOOLS FOR USE THEREWITH[2002/36]
French:DISPOSITIF MATERIEL UNIVERSEL, PROCEDE ET OUTILS UTILISABLES EN ASSOCIATION AVEC CE MATERIEL[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2002National basic fee paid 
01.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2003Fee for grant paid
05.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
IT09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
TR09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
ES20.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
LU28.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2006/51]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
TR09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
ES20.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
LU28.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2005/02]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
ES20.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
LU28.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/46]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
ES20.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
LU28.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/39]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
LU28.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/36]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
CY28.11.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT09.07.2003
FI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
GR09.10.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
PT09.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL09.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[DXY]US5821773  (BUTTS MICHAEL R ET AL) [DX] 1,3,5,9,10,13-20 * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 17; figures 3A,3B,4 * [Y] 7;
 [A]US5543640  (SUTHERLAND JAMES ET AL) [A] 1,3 * column A *;
 [YA]US5778439  (JOHNSON ROBERT ANDERS ET AL) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 1 - line 35 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 35; figure 3A * [A] 50-52;
 [A]GB2315583  (ALTERA CORP) [A] 7 * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 14; figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9952049  (MAGMA DESIGN AUTOMATION INC) [A] 22-27,55-64 * abstract *;
 [A]US5991907  (ABRAMOVICI MIRON ET AL) [A] 44,45,65,66 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 52 *;
 [A]US5911059  (PROFIT JR JACK H) [A] 44,45,65,66 * column W *;
 [A]US5526278  (POWELL GARY P) [A] 46,47 * column 8, line 56 - column 12, line 5 *;
 [A]GB2321989  (ALTERA CORP) [A] 53,54 * page 7, line 31 - page 9, line 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  - MAHAPATRA N R ET AL, "HARDWARE-EFFICIENT AND HIGHLY-RECONFIGURABLE 4- AND 2-TRACK FAULT-TOLERANT DESIGNS FOR MESH-CONNECTED MULTICOMPUTERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FAULT-TOLERANT COMPUTING. SENDAI, JP., JUNE 25 - 27, 1996, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FAULT-TOLERANT COMPUTING, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19960625), vol. CONF. 26, ISBN 0-8186-7261-7, pages 272 - 281, XP000679291 [A] 53,54 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FTCS.1996.535880
ExaminationUS4984192
    - U. Tietze, Ch. Schenk,"Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik", 5th edition, Springer Verlag Berlin, Heidelberg, New York, 1980, pages 491, 492