Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258744

EP1258744 - TRIANGULAR PYRAMID TYPE CUBE-CORNER RETROREFLECTION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-19, Konan 2-chome, Minatu-ku
Tokyo 108-8466 / JP
[2006/17]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Nippon Carbide Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
11-19, Kohnan 2-chome, Minatu-ku
Tokyo 108-8466 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIMURA, Ikuo
3700-5, Butsuden
Uozu-shi, Toyama 937-0061 / JP
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00979939.606.12.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000JP08621
Priority number, dateJP1999035314413.12.1999         Original published format: JP 35314499
[2002/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142822
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258744
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258744
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/124
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:WÜRFELECKEN-RETROREFLEXIONSELEMENT DES DREIECK-PYRAMIDENTYPS[2002/47]
English:TRIANGULAR PYRAMID TYPE CUBE-CORNER RETROREFLECTION ELEMENT[2002/47]
French:ELEMENT RETROREFLECHISSANT TRIEDRE TRIRECTANGLE EN FORME DE PYRAMIDE TRIANGULAIRE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2002Translation filed 
09.07.2002National basic fee paid 
09.07.2002Search fee paid 
09.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
16.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.02.2006Fee for grant paid
10.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Request for further processing for:27.02.2004Request for further processing filed
27.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
CY26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
TR26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
GR27.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
LU06.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
TR26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
GR27.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
LU06.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/19]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
GR27.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/37]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
IT26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/35]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
IT26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
Former [2007/19]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
NL26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
Former [2007/13]AT26.04.2006
BE26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
Former [2007/09]AT26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
DK26.07.2006
SE26.07.2006
PT26.09.2006
Former [2007/03]AT26.04.2006
CH26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
LI26.04.2006
SE26.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT26.04.2006
FI26.04.2006
SE26.07.2006
Former [2006/51]FI26.04.2006
SE26.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE26.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0887665  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5138488  (SZCZECH THEODORE J [US]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH11305017  ;
 [A]US4243618  (VAN ARNAM DONALD E) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1081511  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, [A] 1-11 * abstract *
International search[A]EP0887665  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]);
 [A]JPH11507746  ;
 [A]US5138488  (SZCZECH THEODORE J [US]);
 [A]JPH11149006  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH11305017  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH11305018  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK)