EP1236735 - BENZAMIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Kaoru, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA, Tadakiyo, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
KAYAHARA, Takashi, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2004/05] |
Former [2002/36] | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Kaoru, Ajinomoto Co., Incorporated Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210- / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Tadakiyo, Ajinomoto Co., Incorporated Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210- / JP | |||
03 /
KAYAHARA, Takashi, Ajinomoto Co., Incorporated Pharmaeutical Research Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210- / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2002/36] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00979969.3 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000JP08656 | Priority number, date | JP19990348504 | 08.12.1999 Original published format: JP 34850499 | [2002/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142254 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236735 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236735 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/445, C07F9/572, C07F9/58, C07F9/59, C07F9/6558 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
C07F9/65583 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07F9/572 (EP,US);
C07F9/59 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | C07F9/572 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZAMIDIN-DERIVATE | [2002/36] | English: | BENZAMIDINE DERIVATIVES | [2002/36] | French: | DERIVES BENZAMIDINES | [2003/29] |
Former [2002/36] | DERIVES BENZAMIDINE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2002 | Translation filed | 27.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 25.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2004 | BE | 25.02.2004 | CY | 25.02.2004 | FI | 25.02.2004 | IT | 25.02.2004 | NL | 25.02.2004 | TR | 25.02.2004 | DK | 25.05.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | SE | 25.05.2004 | ES | 05.06.2004 | PT | 25.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
IT | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CY | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
TR | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
SE | 25.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11140040 ; | [E]EP1236712 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [E] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11140040 A 19990525 (KISSEI PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5952307 (POWERS JAMES C [US], et al); | [XP]WO9964392 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al); | [A] - LI MIN ET AL., "Structure-based design and synthesis of novel thrombin inhibitors based on phosphinic peptide mimetics", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, no. 14, pages 1957 - 1962, XP002939724 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00319-4 |