Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237933

EP1237933 - PROCESS OF OXIDISING PRIMARY ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products Zeist B.V.
P.O. Box 360
3700 AJ Zeist / NL
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / GUNNARS, Susanna
Metkroksvägen 6
865 91 Alno / SE
02 / JASCHINSKI, Thomas
Brauergasse 8
68526 Ladenburg / DE
03 / BRAGD, Petter
Iskallareliden 3 B
416 55 Göteborg / SE
 [2002/42]
Former [2002/37]01 / GUNNARS, Susanna
Metkroksvägen 6
865 91 Alno / SE
02 / JASCHINSKI, Thomas
Elfenstrasse 46
68169 Mannheim / DE
03 / BRAGD, Petter
Iskallareliden 3 B
416 55 Göteborg / SE
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2002/37]Jorritsma, Ruurd , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date00980111.908.11.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000NL00812
Priority number, dateEP1999020372608.11.1999         Original published format: EP 99203726
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0134657
Date:17.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237933
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08B31/18, C08B15/04, C07H7/033
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OXIDIERUNG VON PRIMÄREN ALKOHOLEN[2002/37]
English:PROCESS OF OXIDISING PRIMARY ALCOHOLS[2002/37]
French:PROCEDE D'OXYDATION D'ALCOOLS PRIMAIRES[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2002National basic fee paid 
24.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
23.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/04]
07.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9952849  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 13; example 1 *;
 [A]WO9923240  (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al)