Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242812

EP1242812 - INTERFEROMETRIC MICROWAVE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2008
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhino Analytics, LLC
13740 Research Boulevard, Suite M5
Austin, TX 78750 / US
[2007/19]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Rhino Analytics, Llc
13740 Research Boulevard, Suite M5
Austin, TX 78750 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JEAN, Buford, Randall
1051 Red Bud Lane
Austin, TX 78664 / US
02 / WHITEHEAD, Frederick, Lynn
9435 Singing Quail Drive
Austin, TX 78758 / US
03 / DANIEWICZ, John, Lee
10807 Bonaparte Bend
Austin, TX 78750 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Schurack, Eduard F.
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Schurack, Eduard F.
Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00980562.320.11.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US31851
Priority number, dateUS19990166445P19.11.1999         Original published format: US 166445 P
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0136951
Date:25.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242812
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242812
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N22/00
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERFEROMETRISCHER MIKROWELLENSENSOR[2002/39]
English:INTERFEROMETRIC MICROWAVE SENSOR[2002/39]
French:CAPTEUR DE MICRO-ONDES DELTA L, POSSEDANT UNE SENSIBILITE ACCRUE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2002National basic fee paid 
18.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2002Examination requested  [2004/46]
02.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2006
27.11.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2007Fee for grant paid
23.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
TR09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
IE20.11.2007
LU20.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
IE20.11.2007
LU20.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2009/33]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
CY09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
IE20.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/48]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
IE20.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/29]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/23]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
IT09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/19]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
GR10.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/10]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
PT09.10.2007
Former [2008/09]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
NL09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
Former [2008/08]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
DK09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
Former [2008/04]AT09.05.2007
BE09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
Former [2007/50]AT09.05.2007
CH09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
Former [2007/48]CH09.05.2007
FI09.05.2007
LI09.05.2007
SE09.08.2007
ES20.08.2007
Former [2007/47]ES20.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]US5103181  (GAISFORD SCOTT G [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12,14-16,20-27,29,32,34-38,41-44,46-48,52-59,61 * column 3, line 26 - line 50; figures 1-27,35,36 * * column 10, line 17 - column 23, line 20 *;
 [X]JPS607347  ;
 [XY]US3403335  (DEAN COUPER WILLIAM, et al) [X] 1-6,9,11,12,15,21,23,25-27 * abstract * * column 3, lines 54,67 * [Y] 17,18,28,30;
 [X]GB976128  (EURATOM) [X] 1-4,6,9,11,12,15,21,23,25-27 * column 3, line 3 - line 39; figure 2 *;
 [X]JPH075122  ;
 [X]US5073755  (NEUFELD RICHARD D [CA]) [X] 1-6,9-12,21,23,26,27 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 10 - line 13 * * column 5, line 15 - line 26 *;
 [X]US4996489  (SINCLAIR PAUL L [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8,11,12,14,16,21,23,26-28,30 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE2712600  (INNOTEC OY) [X] 1-12,14-16,20,21,23,26-30,32,35,37-44,46-48,52,53,55,57-62 * page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-10; claims 1,6,12 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 22, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]US4544880  (NAGY LOUIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * column 4, line 1 - line 7; figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB1078111  (MICROWAVE INSTR LTD, et al) [Y] 17,18 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 57 - line 85; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4902961  (DE BIBHAS R [US], et al) [Y] 28,30 * column 7, line 6 - line 14; figure 3 *;
 [A]US3500182  (REED WILLIAM C, et al) [A] 17,18,49,50 * column 4, line 23 - line 43; figures 3-7 *;
 [A]US5334941  (KING RAY J [US]) [A] 1,32 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 19; figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850528), vol. 009, no. 122, Database accession no. (P - 359), [X] 1-5,7,9-12,15,17,21-27 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, [X] 1,5,6,17,18,21,23,26,27,32,37,38,49,50,53,55,57-59 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9503542
 US5136249
 JPS6176964
 US5363052
    A. GÖLLER, "Design und Anwendungen von Mikrowellen-Applikatoren", MATERIALFEUCHTEMESSUNG: GRUNDLAGEN, MESSVERFAHREN, APPLIKATIONEN, NORMEN, RENNINGEN-MALMSHEIM, GERMANY, (1997), ISBN 3-8169-1359-8, pages 155 - 164,
    R. KNÖCHEL, "Messverfahren zur Erfassung der Kenngrössen des Mikrowellenfeldes", MATERIALFEUCHTEMESSUNG: GRUNDLAGEN, MESSVERFAHREN, APPLIKATIONEN, NORMEN, RENNINGEN-MALMSHEIM, GERMANY, (1997), ISBN 3-8169-1359-8, pages 165 - 173,
    MICHAEL D. JANEZIC AND JEFFREY A. JARGON, "COMPLEX PERMITTIVITY DETERMINATION FROM PROPAGATION CONSTANT MEASUREMENTS", IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS, (199902), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 76 - 78, XP011035411