Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240211

EP1240211 - A PROCESS FOR HYDROGENATING UNSATURATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUCUL, Dennis, A.
5001 Foxcroft Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Raynor, John , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Raynor, John , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date00980626.621.11.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US31975
Priority number, dateUS19990169567P08.12.1999         Original published format: US 169567 P
US20000191370P22.03.2000         Original published format: US 191370 P
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142319
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240211
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240211
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F8/04, C08C19/02
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRIERUNG VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN POLYMEREN[2002/38]
English:A PROCESS FOR HYDROGENATING UNSATURATED POLYMERS[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE D'HYDROGENATION DE POLYMERES INSATURES[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2002National basic fee paid 
08.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2005Fee for grant paid
21.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
CY21.11.2005
IE21.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/09]AT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE21.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/51]AT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE21.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/48]AT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE21.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]AT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0389119  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]DE2845615  (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; claims 1-8 *;
 [DY]WO9634896  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DY] 1-20 * page 3, line 9 - line 27 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 18 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 27; claims 1-31 *;
 [A]BE660829  (SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ N.V.) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 7 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 5; claims 1-16 *;
 [A]US4452950  (WIDEMAN LAWSON G [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 9; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]FR2344577  (LABOFINA SA [BE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US4284835  (KIM LEO, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [DA]EP0378104  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-10 *