Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235587

EP1235587 - VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S AND AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES COMPRISING ALL-D PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.04.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.05.2009  [2009/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BELLUS Health (International) Limited
Parc scientifique EPFL, PSE Ecublens
1015 Lausanne / CH
[2008/42]
Former [2005/13]For all designated states
Neurochem (International) Limited
PSE-Parc Scientifique sur le site de l'Ecole Polytechnique Féderale de Lausanne
1015 Lausanne (Ecublens) / CH
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
Neurochem (International) Limited
Neuhausstrasse 5
6318 Walchwil Canton Zug / CH
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Neurochem, Inc.
Suite 100, 7220 Frederick-Banting
Montreal, Quebec H4S 2A1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / CHALIFOUR, Robert
332 Place Ladouceur
Ile Bizard, Québec H9C 1T4 / CA
02 / H BERT, Lise
6035 boul. Gouin est
Montreal Nord, Québec H1G 1T4 / CA
03 / KONG, Xianqi
12 Papillon Street
Dollard-des-Ormeaux, Québec H9B 3J7 / CA
04 / GERVAIS, Francine
1003 Bellevue
Ile Bizard, Québec H9C 2X5 / CA
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Jump, Timothy John Simon , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Jump, Timothy John Simon , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00981111.829.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000CA01413
Priority number, dateUS19990168594P29.11.1999         Original published format: US 168594 P
US2000072484228.11.2000         Original published format: US 724842
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0139796
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235587
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPFSTOFFE ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER UND AMYLOID VERWANDTEN KRANKHEITEN ENTHALTEND PEPTIDE BESTEHEND NUR AUS D-AMINOSÄUREN[2002/36]
English:VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S AND AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES COMPRISING ALL-D PEPTIDES[2002/36]
French:VACCIN DESTINE A LA PREVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET D'AUTRES MALADIES ASSOCIEES AUX SUBSTANCES AMYLOIDES[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2002National basic fee paid 
28.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
02.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2007
30.05.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/21]
05.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/21]
Divisional application(s)EP08160607.1   Application withdrawn  : 10.11.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.04.2008Request for further processing filed
01.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200809   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9808868  (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US]) [X] 21-38 * page 3, lines 19-29 * * page 4, lines 7-21 * * page 25, line 26 * * claim - *;
 [PX]WO0068263  (NEUROCHEM INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-9,21-38 * page 5, lines 14-31 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 31 * * claim - *;
 [A]WO9958564  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-49 * page 7, lines 15-29 * * claims 12-14 *;
 [A]  - VAN REGENMORTEL M H ET AL, "D - peptides as immunogens and diagnostic reagents.", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998 AUG) 9 (4) 377-82. REF: 37, XP000990989 [A] 1-49 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(98)80011-6
 [A]  - BENKIRANE NADIA ET AL, "Antigenicity and immunogenicity of modified synthetic peptides containing D-amino acid residues: Antibodies to a D-enantiomer do recognize the parent L-hexapeptide and reciprocally.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 268, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26279 - 26285, XP002164690 [A] 1-49 * the whole document *