Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243268

EP1243268 - MEDICINAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd.
14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd.
14, Kisshoin-Nishinosho-Monguchicho, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANIGUCHI, Norihisa
3-17, Ottominami 2-chome
Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0845 / JP
02 / SHIROUCHI, Yoshiaki
15-29, Saganakadai 2-chome, Kizu-cho
Souraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0223 / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/39]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00981658.813.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000JP08782
Priority number, dateJP1999035402214.12.1999         Original published format: JP 35402299
[2002/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143746
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243268
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/475, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61K31/551, A61P13/12, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D409/14, C07D451/04
[2003/21]
Former International [2002/39]A61K31/475, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61K31/551, A61P13/12, // (C07D401/12, 401:14, 409:14, 451:04, 491:056)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE ZUSAMMENSTELLUNG[2002/39]
English:MEDICINAL COMPOSITION[2002/39]
French:COMPOSITION MEDICINALE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2002Translation filed 
12.07.2002National basic fee paid 
12.07.2002Search fee paid 
12.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
19.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
28.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9323391  (SYNTEX INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-54 *;
 [PY]WO0012074  (SCIOS INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-8 * claims 1-30 *
International search[X]WO9632379  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al);
 [X]JPH1067682  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [XP]WO0069432  (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al);
 [X]WO9806715  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al)