Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243876

EP1243876 - Method of setting a pipe diameter of a refrigerating device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/39]REFRIGERATING DEVICE
[2017/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2017/41]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAIRA, Shigeharu, @Shiga-seisakusho of Daikin Ind
1000-2, Aza Ootani
Okamoto-cho
Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0044 / JP
 [2017/41]
Former [2002/39]01 / TAIRA, Shigeharu, Shiga-seisakusho of Daikin Ind
1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho
Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0044 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/41]
Former [2002/39]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00981798.218.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000JP08952
Priority number, dateJP1999037335028.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37335099
JP2000023093431.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000230934
[2002/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0148427
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243876
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243876
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:F25B1/00, F25B41/00
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/41]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines Rohrdurchmessers eines Kältegerätes[2017/30]
English:Method of setting a pipe diameter of a refrigerating device[2017/30]
French:Procédé pour déterminer le diamètre de tuyaux d'un système de réfrigération[2017/30]
Former [2002/39]KÄLTEVORRICHTUNG
Former [2002/39]REFRIGERATING DEVICE
Former [2002/39]DISPOSITIF FRIGORIFIQUE
Entry into regional phase25.06.2002Translation filed 
25.06.2002National basic fee paid 
25.06.2002Search fee paid 
25.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
23.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2013Observations by third parties
13.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2017Fee for grant paid
22.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2008
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
09.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
19.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
GR12.01.2018
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]AT11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
LU18.12.2017
GR12.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
GR12.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
GR12.01.2018
Former [2018/22]FI11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9841803  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0732550  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0962725  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1162412  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1162413  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - YAJIMA R ET AL, "THE PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF HFC ALTERNATIVE REFRIGERANTS FOR HCFC-22", SCIENCE ET TECHNIQUE DU FROID - REFRIGERATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY. CFC'S, THE DAY AFTER - L'APRES CFC, (19940921), pages 239 - 247, XP008045189 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SPATZ M W ED - INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DU FROID = INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF REFRIGERATION, "Experimental Evaluation of R-22 Alternative Refrigerants in Typical Split-System Heat Pump", 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION. ENERGY, WORKING SUBSTANCES AND ENVIRONMENT. THE HAGUE, AUG. 20 - 25, 1995, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION, PARIS : IIR, FR, (19950820), VOL. IV B, ISBN 2-903633-79-7, pages 1246 - 1253, XP002167718
 [A]  - CAVALLINI A ED - INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DU FROID = INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF REFRIGERATION, "Working fluids for mechanical refrigeration", 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION. ENERGY, WORKING SUBSTANCES AND ENVIRONMENT. THE HAGUE, AUG. 20 - 25, 1995, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION, PARIS : IIR, FR, (19950820), VOL. IV A, ISBN 2-903633-79-7, pages 25 - 42, XP002167719
International search[Y]JPH10195426  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]JPH09208939  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH09151370  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 [Y]WO9841803  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al);
 [XP]WO0052396  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al)
 [Y]  - SHADAN HOJIN NIPPON REITO KYOKAI ED., "Jokyo hyoujun text reito kucho gijutsu", (19880120), pages 133 - 143, XP002937363
ExaminationJPH0931450
 JPH1163710
    - ANONYMOUS, "Daikin Air-conditioner", 19990901, (19990901), pages 1 - 6, XP007921750
    - KOICHI KITA ET AL, "Performance Evaluations of LOW GWP HFe Refrigerants", THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HCFC ALTERNATIVE REFRIGERANTS '98,, (19981126), pages 1 - 7, XP007921752
    - ANONYMOUS, "Japan Society of Refrigeration and Air Conditioning Engineers. Proceedings of Annual Conference passage", JAPAN SOCIETY OF REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING ENGINEERS. PROCEEDINGS OF ANNUAL CONFERENCE - NIHON REITO KUCHOU GAKKAI GAKUJUTSU KOENKAI KOEN RONBUNSHU, NIHON REITO KUCHO GAKKAI, JP, (19990101), ISSN 0285-6867, pages 1 - 8, XP007921751
    - RAPIN P J, "Installations frigorifiques Tome 2", INSTALLATIONS FRIGORIFIQUES, XX, XX, (19880301), vol. 2, pages 251 - 258, XP002209540
by applicantWO9841803
 EP0732550
    - REFRIGERATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19940921), pages 239 - 247,
otherJPH1163710
    - KITA K. ET AL, "Performance evaluations of low-GWP HFC refrigerants", THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HCFC ALTERNATIVE REFRIGERANTS 1998, (19981126), pages 155 - 158, XP008091454