Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242989

EP1242989 - GRADUATED VISUAL AND MANIPULATIVE TRANSLUCENCY FOR WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.06.2017  [2017/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2016/28]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
APPLE COMPUTER, INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BONURA, Thomas
606 El Salto Drive
Capitola, CA 95010 / US
02 / SILVERMAN, Kim
1109 Carlos Privada
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/28]
Former [2009/48]Lang, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2009/41]Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2009/37]Diehl & Partner
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/39]DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date00982078.824.11.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US30158
Priority number, dateUS1999046731620.12.1999         Original published format: US 467316
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146942
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242989
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242989
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/14, G06F3/033
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/08]
Former [2004/22]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:ABGESTUFTE SICHTBARE UND MANIPULATIVE TRANSPARENZ FÜR FENSTER[2002/39]
English:GRADUATED VISUAL AND MANIPULATIVE TRANSLUCENCY FOR WINDOWS[2002/39]
French:TRANSPARENCE MANIPULATOIRE ET A GRADATION VISIBLE POUR FENETRES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2016Fee for grant paid
01.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10011078.2  / EP2325835
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2007
Opposition(s)18.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0605945  (FIRSTPERSON INC [US]) [X] 26,27,32 * page 6, line 39 - page 9, line 40; figure 10 *;
 [A]WO9837483  (GALLIUM SOFTWARE INC [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 15; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5808605  (SHIEH JOHNNY MENG-HAN [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 51 *
Examination   - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Reducing desktop clutter in GUI", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19980701), vol. 411, no. 119, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007123096