Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257945

EP1257945 - TECHNOLOGY SHARING DURING ASSET MANAGEMENT AND ASSET TRACKING IN A NETWORK-BASED SUPPLY CHAIN ENVIRONMENT AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.03.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture LLP
1661 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / MIKURAK, Michael, G.
108 Englewood Blvd.
Hamilton, NJ 08610 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2004/30]Chivarov, Georgui, Dr. Dipl.Ing.
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2004/25](deleted)
...
Former [2002/47]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00982230.522.11.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000US32310
Priority number, dateUS1999044465322.11.1999         Original published format: US 444653
US1999044762322.11.1999         Original published format: US 447623
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0139086
Date:31.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257945
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEMEINSAMER ZUGRIFF AUF TECHNOLOGIE WÄHREND DER VERWALTUNG UND ORTUNG VON BETRIEBSMITTELN IN EINER NETZWERKGESTÜTZTEN, AUF EINE VERSORGUNGSKETTE BEZOGENEN UMGEBUNG UND DAZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN[2002/47]
English:TECHNOLOGY SHARING DURING ASSET MANAGEMENT AND ASSET TRACKING IN A NETWORK-BASED SUPPLY CHAIN ENVIRONMENT AND METHOD THEREOF[2002/47]
French:PARTAGE TECHNOLOGIQUE LORS DE LA GESTION ET DU SUIVI DU PARC INFORMATIQUE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DU TYPE CHAINE D'APPROVISIONNEMENT RESEAUTEE, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2002National basic fee paid 
24.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
14.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2007
23.11.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/16]
09.12.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inExamination WO9805152
  EP0834818
  EP0834819
  US5515367
  EP0795948
  EP0767436
  US5790546
  EP0420493
  US5113499
  US5867495
  WO9847298
  US5787425
  US5692107
  US5787274
  US5892900
  US5905973
  US5710887
  EP0807891
  US5845256
  WO9837675
  WO9615505
  EP0749081
  US5783069
  US5752238
  EP0865006
  US5905860
  EP0332304
  US5023907
  WO9311480
  WO9826363
  EP0710942
  US5890139
  WO9512859