Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238088

EP1238088 - INSECTICIDE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2005  [2005/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genoptera, LLC
P.O. Box 511, 170 Harbor Way
South San Francisco, CA 94083-0511 / US
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / EBENS, Allen, James, Jr.
1786 27th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
02 / KEEGAN, Kevin, Patrick
8989 Renato Street
San Diego CA 92129 / US
03 / STOUT, Thomas, J.
128 Galewood Circle
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
 [2002/43]
Former [2002/37]01 / EBENS, Allen, James, Jr.
1786 27th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
02 / KEEGAN, Kevin, Patrick
1408 Sayre Street
San Leandro, CA 94579 / US
03 / STOUT, Thomas, J.
128 Galewood Circle
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00982530.807.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US33320
Priority number, dateUS19990169610P08.12.1999         Original published format: US 169610 P
US19990173228P28.12.1999         Original published format: US 173228 P
US19990173349P28.12.1999         Original published format: US 173349 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0142479
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238088
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/61, C12N15/12, C12N15/60, C12N9/90, C07K14/435, C12N9/88, C12Q1/533, G01N33/68, C12Q1/527, A01K67/033, A01H5/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40
[2004/38]
Former International [2002/37]C12N15/61, C12N15/12, C12N15/60, C12N9/90, C07K14/435, C12N9/88, C12Q1/533, G01N33/68, C12Q1/527, A01K67/027, A01H5/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZIELE FÜR INSEKTIZIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG[2002/37]
English:INSECTICIDE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE[2002/37]
French:CIBLES INSECTICIDES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2002National basic fee paid 
02.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
06.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/30]
21.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9622307  (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9416071  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9113167  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO0047731  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [PX] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ADAMS M AND VENTER J C, "Drosophila melanogaster HTG", DATABASE EM_HTG, EMBL Heidelberg, Germany, (19991117), XP002170414 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - KANEMAKI M ET AL, "TIP49b, a new RuvB-like DNA helicase, is included in a complex together with another RuvB-like DNA helicase, TIP49a.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990806), vol. 274, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22437 - 22444, XP002170411 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26,27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.32.22437
 [X]  - GOHSHI T ET AL, "Molecular cloning of mouse p47, a second group mammalian RuvB DNA helicase-like protein: Homology with those from human and Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY (TOKYO), (199905), vol. 125, no. 5, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 939 - 946, XP002170412 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19
 [PX]  - BAUER A ET AL, "Pontin52 and Reptin52 function as antagonistic regulators of beta-catenin signalling activity.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (20001115), vol. 19, no. 22, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 6121 - 6130, XP002170413 [PX] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/19.22.6121
 [PX]  - ADAMS M D ET AL., "CG9750 protein, rept, Drosophila melanogaster", DATABASE SWALL, EMBL Heidelberg, Germany, (20000501), XP002170415 [PX] 22 * abstract *