Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257419

EP1257419 - COMPONENT FOR A FOUR COLOR PRINTHEAD MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2008
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Silverbrook, Kia, Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd
393 Darling Street
Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU
02 / King, Tobin Allen
Unit 2, 125 Cremorne Road
Cremorne, NSW 2090 / AU
03 / Jackson, Garry Raymond
6 St Davis Road
Haberfield, NSW 2045 / AU
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Moore, Barry
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]Moore, Barry
Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2002/47]Hofmann, Harald
Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65
80068 München / DE
Application number, filing date00982771.807.12.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000AU01514
Priority number, dateAU1999PQ0455909.12.1999         Original published format: AU PQ455999
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142020
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257419
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257419
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/145, B41J2/14
[2004/25]
Former International [2002/47]B41J2/145
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesAL09.07.2002
LT09.07.2002
LV09.07.2002
MK09.07.2002
RO09.07.2002
SI09.07.2002
TitleGerman:MODULELEMENT FUR EIN VIERFARBENDRUCKKOPFMODUL[2002/47]
English:COMPONENT FOR A FOUR COLOR PRINTHEAD MODULE[2002/47]
French:ELEMENT DE MODULE DE TETE D'IMPRESSION QUADRICHROME[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2002National basic fee paid 
09.07.2002Search fee paid 
09.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
09.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2007Fee for grant paid
27.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
CY13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
IT13.02.2008
NL13.02.2008
TR13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
GR14.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
PT14.07.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
CY13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
IT13.02.2008
NL13.02.2008
TR13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
PT14.07.2008
Former [2009/39]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
CY13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
IT13.02.2008
NL13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
PT14.07.2008
Former [2009/33]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
CY13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
NL13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
PT14.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
NL13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
PT14.07.2008
Former [2008/46]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
DK13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
SE13.05.2008
ES24.05.2008
Former [2008/43]AT13.02.2008
BE13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
ES24.05.2008
Former [2008/39]AT13.02.2008
FI13.02.2008
ES24.05.2008
Former [2008/35]ES24.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0564102  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * column 6, line 50 - line 55 * * column 7, line 15 - line 20 * * figures 1A,6 *;
 [A]WO9852763  (XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 * * page 7, line 2 - line 16 *;
 [A]DE19651050  (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *
International search[A]EP0611653  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]);
 [A]JPH0885213
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 23, Database accession no. 1996-224719, XP002978817 & JPH0885213 A 19960402 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK)