Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242658

EP1242658 - CONTINUOUS POLYMERIZATION AND DIRECT FIBER SPINNING AND SYSTEMS FOR ACCOMPLISHING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF CORPORATION
3000 Continental Drive North
Mount Olive
New Jersey 07828-1234 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
BASF CORPORATION
3000 Continental Drive North
Mount Olive, New Jersey 07828-1234 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURLONE, Dominick, A.
25 Forest Edge Drive
Asheville, NC 28806 / US
02 / HOYT, Matthew, B.
5807 Long Pond Way
Evansville, IN 47711 / US
03 / HELMS, Charles, F., Jr.
116 Barrington Court
Greenwood, SC 29640 / US
04 / HODAN, John, A.
4 Glenwood Circle
Arden, NC 28704 / US
05 / KOTEK, Richard
2117B Gorman Street
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
06 / MORGAN, Doris, C.
21 Shackelford Drive
Asheville, NC 28806 / US
07 / SFERRAZZA, Randall, A.
18 Willow Road
Asheville, NC 28804 / US
08 / WANG, Fang
5 Bramble Court
Arden, NC 28704 / US
09 / ILG, Otto, M.
6 Westwood Road
Asheville, NC 28803 / US
10 / ROBERT, Terry
2311 Smokey Park Highway
Candler, NC 28715 / US
11 / MORROW, Ronald, G.
P.O. Box 831
Enka, NC 28728 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Meyer, Udo , et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Meyer, Udo , et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date00983220.505.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000EP12205
Priority number, dateUS1999047567530.12.1999         Original published format: US 475675
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0149906
Date:12.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242658
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/60, D01D1/06, C08G69/18
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN POLYMERISATION UND DIREKTFASERSPINNEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2002/39]
English:CONTINUOUS POLYMERIZATION AND DIRECT FIBER SPINNING AND SYSTEMS FOR ACCOMPLISHING SAME[2002/39]
French:POLYMERISATION CONTINUE ET BOBINAGE DE FIBRES DIRECT ET SYSTEME DE MISE EN OEUVRE CORRESPONDANTS[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2002National basic fee paid 
05.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
02.08.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/40]
Cited inInternational search[XA]US3376369  (FRANK FISHER CHARLES) [X] 11,20 * column W * [A] 10-19,21-28;
 [XA]GB919246  (BADISCHE ANILIN M SODA FABRIK) [X] 11,20 * the whole document * [A] 10-19,21-28;
 [XA]GB969989  (BASF AG) [X] 11,20 * the whole document * [A] 10-19,21-28;
 [A]GB1089360  (DEGUSSA) [A] 1-10,29-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1289349  (THE POLYMER CORPORATION) [A] 1-10,29-35 * the whole document *