Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240376

EP1240376 - WASHING CONTAINER FOR A WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2004/05]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEYDER, Reinhard
Rotbuchenweg 12
13403 Berlin / DE
02 / SKRIPPEK, Jörg
Dyrotzer Winkel 1
14641 Priort / DE
 [2002/38]
Application number, filing date00983236.106.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000EP12298
Priority number, dateDE199916050115.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960501
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144556
Date:21.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240376
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240376
Date:17.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/26, D06F37/30
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:LAUGENBEHÄLTER FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE[2002/38]
English:WASHING CONTAINER FOR A WASHING MACHINE[2002/38]
French:CONTENANT A LESSIVE POUR MACHINE A LAVER[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2002National basic fee paid 
15.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2003Fee for grant paid
29.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.11.2004  13.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/51]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2004  13.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Former [2005/02]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2004   
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
24.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.11.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2006
13.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2006Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
30.11.2006Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
PT17.08.2004
AT06.12.2004
LU06.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/09]CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
AT06.12.2004
LU06.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/34]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
AT06.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/13]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/51]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
BE31.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/45]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI17.03.2004
IE17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2333300  (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 9; figure 4 *;
 [Y]DE19724930  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2202867  (FAINI SPA) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE9215811U  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0219115  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *