Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237439

EP1237439 - TOOTHBRUSH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jordan AS
Haavard Martinsens vei 30
0978 Oslo / NO
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BRAATEN, Stig
Inga Bjoernsons vei 41
N-0969 Oslo / NO
02 / OEXSETH, Geir
Ellefs vei 18
N-1392 Vettre / NO
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Säfwenberg, Björn , et al
Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB
Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Säfwenberg, Björn , et al
Enrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10 316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date00983580.214.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000NO00427
Priority number, dateNO1999000630317.12.1999         Original published format: NO 996303
[2002/37]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143582
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237439
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A46B5/02
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHNBÜRSTENVORRICHTUNG[2002/37]
English:TOOTHBRUSH DEVICE[2002/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BROSSE A DENTS[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2000Translation filed 
15.06.2002National basic fee paid 
15.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
17.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
19.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/06]
05.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]NO167492B  (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]);
 [X]WO9510959  (ADDIS LTD [GB], et al);
 [X]WO9215224  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [X]DE29709359U  (STANGE DIRK [DE])