Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238272

EP1238272 - PROCESS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY EVALUATING A PLURALITY OF CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UOP LLC
25 East Algonquin Road
Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / AKPORIAYE, Duncan, E.
Kristine Bonnevies vei 15
N-0592 Oslo / NO
02 / KARLSSON, Arne
Gragasveien 1C
N-1187 Oslo / NO
03 / DAHL, Ivar, M.
Kongsberggate 6
N-0468 Oslo / NO
04 / WENDELBO, Rune
Peer Gynts vei 2
N-0851 Oslo / NO
05 / VANDEN BUSSCHE, Kurt, M.
705 Mohican Trail
Lake in the Hills, IL 60102 / US
06 / TOWLER, Gavin, P.
147 Hager Avenue
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date00983783.214.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US32422
Priority number, dateUS1999046431315.12.1999         Original published format: US 464313
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0144801
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238272
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N31/10
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN BEWERTUNG VON MEHREREN KATALYSATOREN[2002/37]
English:PROCESS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY EVALUATING A PLURALITY OF CATALYSTS[2002/37]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ANALYSER SIMULTANEMENT PLUSIEURS CATALYSEURS[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2002National basic fee paid 
13.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
11.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/34]
01.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE19809477  (SCHUETH FERDI [DE]) [Y] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9852685  (KAYSER TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5102628  (DE LASA HUGO I [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2327754  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19546192  (VOS HARALD PROF DR SC NAT [DE]) [A] 11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9315829  (UNIV KINGSTON [CA]) [A] 11 * abstract *;
 [A]US4099923  (MILBERGER ERNEST C) [A] 1 * abstract *