Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256117

EP1256117 - METHOD TO PROVIDE A REDUCED CONSTANT E-FIELD DURING ERASE OF EEPROMS FOR RELIABILITY IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2007
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[2008/36]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLEVELAND, Lee
3428 Saint Marys Place
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Picker, Madeline Margaret
Brookes Batchellor LLP
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Picker, Madeline Margaret
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date00983940.805.12.2000
[2002/46]
WO2000US33044
Priority number, dateUS19990172327P17.12.1999         Original published format: US 172327 P
US2000049035124.01.2000         Original published format: US 490351
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145113
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256117
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/14
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/21]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERVORBRINGUNG EINES KONSTANTEN FELDES MIT GERINGER ELEKTIZITÄT WÄHREND DES LÖSCHENS EINES EEPROMS ZUR ZUVERLÄSSIGKEITSVERBESSERUNG[2002/46]
English:METHOD TO PROVIDE A REDUCED CONSTANT E-FIELD DURING ERASE OF EEPROMS FOR RELIABILITY IMPROVEMENT[2002/46]
French:PROCEDE DESTINE A FOURNIR UN CHAMP ELECTRIQUE CONSTANT REDUIT DURANT L'EFFACEMENT DE MEMOIRES DE TYPE EEPROM AFIN D'AMELIORER LEUR FIABILITE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2002National basic fee paid 
16.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
04.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/39]
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/39]
20.08.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2007
20.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.10.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5485423  (TANG YUAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column W *;
 [X]US5978277  (HSU FU-CHANG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 28; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US5838618  (LEE JIAN-HSING [TW], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 2B,4-6 *