Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238473

EP1238473 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING POWER AND DATA USING TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEX TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 28.02.2007  [2007/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ED & D, Inc.
36 Gaham Avenue
Oviedo, FL 32765 / US
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BATEMAN, David, E.
3681 Lake Harney Circle
Geneva, FL 32732 / US
02 / BUSH, Matthew
1101 Brielle Court
Oviedo, FL 32765 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Finck, Dieter , et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Patentanwälte
Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing. , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
Former [2002/37]Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00984157.807.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US33503
Priority number, dateUS19990169575P08.12.1999         Original published format: US 169575 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143304
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238473
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238473
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/54
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON STROMVERSORGUNG UND DATEN MITTELS ZEITMULTIPLEXÜBERTRAGUNG[2002/37]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING POWER AND DATA USING TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEX TRANSMISSION[2002/37]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR EMETTRE ET RECEVOIR DE LA PUISSANCE ET DES DONNEES EN UTILISANT LA TRANSMISSION MULTIPLEX A REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2002National basic fee paid 
04.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
10.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2003Fee for grant paid
19.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
CY28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
LU07.12.2004
[2007/09]
Former [2006/51]AT28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2005/02]CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2004/52]CH28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2004/51]CH28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4535401  (PENN THOMAS C [US]) [X] 1-30 * column 1, line 41 - line 60 * * column 3, line 30 - line 58 * * column 4, line 3 - line 28 * * column 5, line 21 - line 29 *;
 [X]US4926158  (ZEIGLER JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-30 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 19 - line 29 * * column 8, line 37 - line 52 *;
 [AD]US4059729  (EDDY WESLEY L, et al) [AD] 1-30 * abstract *