02.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
28.01.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
19.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
06.02.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
23.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.11.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.09.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.02.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.11.2002 |
First examination report |
|
11.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
02.08.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
30.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|