Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240082

EP1240082 - PACKAGING MACHINE AND APPARATUS FOR TIGHTENING WRAPAROUND CARTONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC
One High Ridge Park Stamford
Connecticut 06905 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC
One High Ridge Park
Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
The Mead Corporation
Courthouse Plaza, Northeast
Dayton Ohio 30080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PORTRAIT, Pascal
27/4, rue J. Diligent
F-36800 Saint Gaultier / FR
02 / MARTINI, Pascal
10, Allée de Fontarce
F-36330 Le Poinçonnet / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Avidity IP
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2002/38]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB
Application number, filing date00984189.111.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US33553
Priority number, dateGB1999002935010.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9929350
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142084
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240082
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240082
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65B25/06, B65B11/10
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNGSMACHINE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STRAFFEN VON KARTONUMHÜLLUNGEN[2002/38]
English:PACKAGING MACHINE AND APPARATUS FOR TIGHTENING WRAPAROUND CARTONS[2002/38]
French:ENCARTONNEUSE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CARTONS WRAP-AROUND[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2002National basic fee paid 
10.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2003Fee for grant paid
20.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
CY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
TR24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
PT24.08.2004
LU11.12.2004
IE13.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/09]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
CY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
TR24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
LU11.12.2004
IE13.12.2004
Former [2006/51]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
TR24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE13.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
IE13.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT24.03.2004
BE24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT24.03.2004
CH24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
LI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI24.03.2004
SE24.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US3543473  (CATO CARL P) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 3, line 70 - column 5, line 27; figures 7-10 *;
 [X]US3815320  (GANZ R) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 20; figures 2,3,6,7 *;
 [X]US4338760  (KUHN WERNER) [X] 1,2,8-10 * column 4, lines 41-56; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4243143  (MULLER ROLF) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 7; figures 3-5 *;
 [X]GB1114685  (WEYERHAEUSER CO) [X] 11,12 * figures 1-18; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2939258  (ANNESS RUSSELL W) [A] 11,12 * the whole document *