Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238170

EP1238170 - Liquid dispensing device for toilet bowls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/37]IMPROVED LIQUID DISPENSING TOILET BOWL CLEANER
[2006/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
1525 Howe Street Racine
Wisconsin 53403 / US
[2006/24]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
1525 Howe Street
Racine, Wisconsin 53403 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VARANASI, Padma, Prabodh
2 Cherrywood Court
Racine, WI 53402 / US
02 / HARRITY, Kevin
10350 S. Mockingbird Lane
Oak Creek, WI 53154 / US
03 / LEONARD, Stephen, B.
8629 Talamasca Drive
Franksville, WI 53126 / US
04 / MOODYCLIFFE, Timothy, I.
270 East Highland Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2003/17]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2002/37]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date00984297.213.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US33756
Priority number, dateUS1999046057014.12.1999         Original published format: US 460570
US2000061487312.07.2000         Original published format: US 614873
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144591
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238170
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238170
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:E03D9/03
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsspender zur Reinigung von Toilettenbecken[2006/06]
English:Liquid dispensing device for toilet bowls[2006/06]
French:Distributeur de liquide de nettoyage des cuvettes de toilettes[2006/06]
Former [2002/37]VERBESSERTER FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDER ZUR REINIGUNG VON TOILETTENBECKEN
Former [2002/37]IMPROVED LIQUID DISPENSING TOILET BOWL CLEANER
Former [2002/37]DISTRIBUTEUR AMELIORE DE LIQUIDE DE NETTOYAGE DES CUVETTES DE TOILETTES
Entry into regional phase28.06.2002National basic fee paid 
28.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2006Fee for grant paid
12.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
CY14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
TR14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE13.12.2006
LU13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
TR14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE13.12.2006
LU13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/19]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/48]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
IE13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/37]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/35]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/19]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT14.06.2006
BE14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT14.06.2006
CH14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
LI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE14.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[PXA]WO0042261  (JEYES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,7,8,12,13,19-24,26,29,31,32;
 [PXA]WO9966140  (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US], et al) [PX] 1 * page 9, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 2; figures 1-4,11,12A-15B * [A] 3-5,7,12,13,15,19-24,29-32;
 [A]EP0878586  (BUCK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,22-24 * column 4, line 7 - line 31 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 10; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9809027  (PROD HYODALL LAB DES [FR], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *