Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242453

EP1242453 - DNA ENCODING SNORF62 AND SNORF72 RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H. Lundbeck A/S
Ottiliavej 9
2500 Valby-Copenhagen / DK
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
H. Lundbeck A/S
Ottiliavej 9
2500 Valby-Copenhagen / DK
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Synaptic Pharmaceutical Corporation
215 College Road
Paramus, NJ 07652 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BONINI, James, A.
80 Manito Avenue
Oakland, NJ 07436 / US
02 / LERMAN, Gabriel, S.
52 Werner Place
Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US
03 / QUAN, Yong
13 Wisteria Drive Apartment 3M
Fords, NJ 08863 / US
04 / OGOZALEK, Kristine
25 Durand Place
Rochelle Park, NJ 07662 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Meidahl Petersen, John
c/o H. Lundbeck A/S
9, Ottiliavej
2500 Valby Copenhagen / DK
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]Meidahl Petersen, John
c/o H. Lundbeck A/S 9, Ottiliavej
2500 Valby Copenhagen / DK
Former [2002/39]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00984313.713.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US33787
Priority number, dateUS1999046643517.12.1999         Original published format: US 466435
US2000055809925.04.2000         Original published format: US 558099
US2000060914630.06.2000         Original published format: US 609146
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144297
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242453
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/72, C07H21/04, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, G01N33/53
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÜR SNORF62 UND SNORF72 REZEPTOREN KODIERENDE DNA[2002/39]
English:DNA ENCODING SNORF62 AND SNORF72 RECEPTORS[2002/39]
French:ADN CODANT POUR DES RECEPTEURS SNORF62 ET SNORF72[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Search fee paid 
17.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
21.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200203   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]  TAN C P ET AL, "CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A HUMAN AND MURINE T-CELL ORPHAN G-PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTOR SIMILAR TO THE GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE AND NEUROTENSIN RECEPTORS", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, vol. 52, no. 522, ISSN 0888-7543, (1998), Database accession no. AF044600, pages 223 - 229, URL: EBI, XP000879493 [X] 1,7,9,11,16-18,20,22,27,38,41,49,51,61,63,65,67,72,73,76,78,80,82,84,95,105,110,112,114,116,118,120,122,124,126,128,130,132,134,136,138,141,143 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5441
 [X]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. AF044600, URL: EBI, [X] 1,7,9,11,16-18,20,22,27,38,41,49,51,61,63,65,67,72,73,76,78,80,82,84,95,105,110,112,114,116,118,120,122,124,126,128,130,132,134,136,138,141,143 * abstract *
 [X]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. AC008571, URL: EBI, XP002243792 [X] 2-6,8,10,12-15,19,21,23-26,28-37,39,40,42-48,50,52,55-60,62,64,66,68-71,74,75,77,79,81,83,85,87-94,96-101,103,104,106-109,111,113,115,117,119,121 * abstract *
 [X]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. HS474279, URL: EBI, XP002243793 [X] 2-6,8,10,12-15,19,21,23-26,28-37,39,40,42-48,50,52,55-60,62,64,66,68-71,74,75,77,79,81,83,85,87-94,96-101,103,104,106-109,111,113,115,117,119,121 * abstract *
 [X]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. O55040, URL: EBI, XP002243794 [X] 2-6,8,10,12-15,19,21,23-26,28-37,39,40,42-48,50,52,55-60,62,64,66,68-71,74,75,77,79,81,83,85,87-94,96-101,103,104,106-109,111,113,115,117,119,121 * abstract *
 [PX]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. AAY71296, URL: EBI, XP002243795 [PX] 2-6,8,10,12-15,19,21,23-26,28-37,39,40,42-48,50,52,55-60,62,64,66,68-71,74,75,77,79,81,83,85,87-94,96-101,103,104,106-109,111,113,115,117,119,121 * abstract *
 [PX]  DATABASE EBI, Database accession no. AAB02830, URL: EBI, XP002243796 [PX] 2-6,8,10,12-15,19,21,23-26,28-37,39,40,42-48,50,52,55-60,62,64,66,68-71,74,75,77,79,81,83,85,87-94,96-101,103,104,106-109,111,113,115,117,119,121 * abstract *
International search[XP]WO0002919  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al);
 [X]WO9955732  (ASTRA PHARMA INC [CA], et al);
 [X]  - TAN ET AL., "Orphan G protein-coupled receptor", DATABASE SPTREMBL_15, EMBL/GENBANK, Database accession no. O43664, XP002940223
 [X]  - MCKEE ET AL., "Orphan G protein-coupled receptor", DATABASE SPTREMBL_15, EMBL/GENBANK, Database accession no. O55040, XP002940224
 [AP]  - FUJII ET AL., "Identification of neuromedin U as the cognate ligand of the orphan G protein-coupled receptor FM-3", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000714), vol. 275, no. 28, pages 21068 - 21074, XP002940225

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M001546200
    [] - DATABASE GENBANK, Database accession no. Q9JJI5, XP002940226
 [X]  - MCKEE ET AL., "Mus musculus orphan G protein-coupled receptor mRNA, complete cds", DATABASE GENEMBL, Database accession no. AF044602, XP002940227
 [X]  - TAN ET AL., "Homo sapeins orphan G protein-coupled receptor gene, first coding exon", DATABASE GENEMBL, Database accession no. AF044600, XP002940228
 [X]  - HILLIER ET AL., "The washU-merck EST project", DATABASE EST, Database accession no. N45474, XP002940229
 [XP]  - HOWARD ET AL., "Identification of receptors for neuromedin U and its role in feeding", NATURE, (20000706), vol. 406, pages 70 - 74, XP002940230

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35017610
    [] - DATABASE GENBANK, Database accession no. AF242874, XP002940231