Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242699

EP1242699 - ANCHORING SYSTEM FOR CERAMIC LINING TILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLAIR, Keith, E.
37 Packenah Trail
Vincentown, NJ 08088-8910 / US
02 / ERSKINE, Charles, P.
915 Shiloh Road
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Troch, Geneviève , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Troch, Geneviève , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date00984317.814.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000US33794
Priority number, dateUS1999046080514.12.1999         Original published format: US 460805
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0144597
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242699
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/08, F27D1/14, E04B2/02
[2004/37]
Former International [2002/39]E04F13/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERANKERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE KERAMISCHE VERKLEIDUNGSKACHEL[2002/39]
English:ANCHORING SYSTEM FOR CERAMIC LINING TILE[2002/39]
French:SYSTEME DE FIXATION D'UN DOUBLAGE DE CARREAUX CERAMIQUES[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2002National basic fee paid 
26.06.2002Search fee paid 
26.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
03.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/52]
10.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5363620  (LIU HAN-DU [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14,16,17 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]GB2259531  (LORITECH LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-11,13,14,16,17 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US4516373  (OSAWA YOSHINORI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14,16,17 * figures 15-18; claim - *;
 [A]EP0061537  (SEVINK THEODOR JOHANN) [A] 1,3-5 * figure 1; claim 4 *;
 [A]US1723500  (CALVIN CAMPBELL) [A] 1,3-5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]FR2110306  (VISSING & LINSMAYER) [A] 1,3-5 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]FR613987  (UTILISATION DES COMBUSTIBLES S) [A] 3-5 * page 3, lines 3-14; figures 1,5,6 *;
 [A]US4987712  (MANCUSO NOEL A M [AU]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
International search[X]US5881522  (DOBIJA MICHAEL J [US]);
 [XP]US6138423  (POUTANEN TUOMO [FI], et al);
 [Y]US5238721  (NAKAZAWA MASAHIRO [JP]);
 [AE]US6189289  (QUAGLIA NATALE [IT], et al)