Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240393

EP1240393 - BACKFLOW PREVENTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WATTS INVESTMENT COMPANY
801 west Street
Wilmington DE 19801-1545 / US
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HORNE, Timothy, P.
94 Porter Road
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / TRIPP, Dale, S.
65 Boston Road
North Andover, MA 01845 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date00984375.614.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US33907
Priority number, dateUS1999046192815.12.1999         Original published format: US 461928
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144588
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240393
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:E03C1/10
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:RÜCKFLUSS-VERHINDERUNGSANORDNUNG[2002/38]
English:BACKFLOW PREVENTER ASSEMBLY[2002/38]
French:ENSEMBLE DISPOSITIF ANTI-REFOULEMENT[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2002National basic fee paid 
15.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
06.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200203   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003
31.12.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2310586  (LOHMAN JOHN T, et al) [X] 1,10,11,25-28,30,33,43 * page 2, column R, line 3 - page 3, column L, line 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5404905  (LAURIA THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1,6,7,19,20,31-33,35,36,39,40,42,46-49 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 10; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0461647  (AMES CO [US]) [A] 1,19,23-26,31-33,35-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2204669  (MYCO ENGINEERING LIMITED) [A] 1,6,7,23,24,32,33,35-40,46,47 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3626977  (RILEY JAMES H, et al) [A] 1,4,5,33,41 * column 3, line 4 - line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2227811  (CRANE LTD [GB]) [A] 14-16,21,22,34,50 * page 3, line 18 - line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5746417  (BOWERS DAVID LAMAR [US], et al) [A] 17,18 * column 4, line 47 - line 53; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2710023  (BLACKFORD RAYMOND H, et al)