Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315566

EP1315566 - RAPID THERMAL RECYCLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oldenburg, Kevin R.
665 Riverpoint Boulevard Spokane
Washington 99202 / US
[2006/27]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Oldenburg, Kevin R.
6 Lafayette Place
Chadds Ford, PA 193717 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Gill, David Alan
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Gill, David Alan
W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date00984534.818.10.2000
[2003/23]
WO2000US41240
Priority number, dateUS2000065502105.09.2000         Original published format: US 655021
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220161
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315566
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315566
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, B01L7/00
[2004/14]
Former International [2003/23]B01L3/00, B32B5/02, C12M1/22, C12M1/38, G05D23/00, F25B29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLEN THERMISCHEN RECYCLING[2003/23]
English:RAPID THERMAL RECYCLING DEVICE[2003/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CYCLAGE THERMIQUE RAPIDE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2003National basic fee paid 
10.03.2003Search fee paid 
10.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
01.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2006Fee for grant paid
27.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
05.04.200303   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CY05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
LU18.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
LU18.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2008/19]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/48]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/37]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/35]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/28]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT05.07.2006
FI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/22]FI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/19]FI05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/12]FI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/09]FI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0542422  (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [X] 5,18 * column 9, line 15 - column 11, line 8 *;
 [X]US5919622  (MACHO HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 5-8,18 * column 8, line 34 - column 9, line 40 *
International search[X]US5863507  (JAMES LIZYMOL [US]);
 [X]US5819842  (POTTER DEREK HENRY [GB], et al);
 [X]US5721136  (FINNEY MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [X]US5604130  (WARNER BRIAN D [US], et al);
 [X]US5061630  (KNOPF ULRICH C [CH], et al);
 [X]US4116777  (TAKATSY GYULA, et al);
 [XE]US6153426  (HEIMBERG WOLFGANG [DE]);
 [XE]US6171850  (NAGLE ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]US5236666  (HULETTE WILLIAM C [US], et al);
 [A]US5432086  (FRAENZL GERT [AT], et al);
 [A]US5525300  (DANSSAERT JOHN L [US], et al);
 [A]US5681492  (VAN PRAET PETER [BE])