Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237924

EP1237924 - SEX-CHROMOSOME-SPECIFIC PROTEINS, SPECIES SPECIFIC AND SPERM SPECIFIC PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH
Reynolds Building, Room 209, Guelph
Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH
Reynolds Building, Room 209
Guelph, Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / BLECHER, Stan, R.
141 Janefield Avenue
Guelph, Ontario N1G 2L4 / CA
02 / DETMAR, Jacqueline
2150 Safari Road
Cambridge, Ontario N1R 5S2 / CA
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Chapman, Paul Gilmour , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Chapman, Paul Gilmour , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date00984685.807.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000CA01437
Priority number, dateUS19990169283P07.12.1999         Original published format: US 169283 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0142283
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237924
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/705, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, C07K16/28, A61K39/395
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESCLECHTSCHROMOSOMEN-SPEZIFISCHE, SPEZIES-SPEZIFISCHE UND SPERMA-SPEZIFISCHE PROTEINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ISOLIERUNG[2002/37]
English:SEX-CHROMOSOME-SPECIFIC PROTEINS, SPECIES SPECIFIC AND SPERM SPECIFIC PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR THEIR IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION[2002/37]
French:PROTEINES SPECIFIQUES AU CHROMOSOME SEXUEL, PROTEINES SPECIFIQUES AUX ESPECES ET AU SPERME ET LEURS METHODES D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'ISOLATION[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2002National basic fee paid 
01.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
26.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/31]
13.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO9707399  (UNIV GUELPH [CA], et al) [XD] 1-6,14,20-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5660997  (SPAULDING GLENN F [US]) [X] 1-6,14,20-30 * column 4 * * the whole document *;
 [X]US4448767  (BRYANT BERNARD J [US]) [X] 14 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9117188  (TECHNOLODGY PTY LIMITED AB [AU]) [X] 14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9013315  (CYTOGAM INC [US]);
 [AD]  - HENDRIKSEN P J, "DO X AND Y SPERMATOZOA DIFFER IN PROTEINS ?", THERIOGENOLOGY (1999 DEC) 52 (8) 1295-307 REF 69, XP001012064

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-691X(99)00218-6
 [AD]  - HOWES E A ET AL, "A search for sex-specific antigens on bovine spermatozoa using immunological and biochemical techniques to compare the protein profiles of X and Y chromosome-bearing sperm populations separated by fluorescence-activated cell sorting.", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTION AND FERTILITY, (1997), vol. 110, no. 2, ISSN 0022-4251, pages 195 - 204, XP001010036

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/jrf.0.1100195