Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240761

EP1240761 - DATA ALLOCATION WITH IMPERFECT TIME-DOMAIN EQUALISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zarlink Semiconductor Inc.
350 Legget Drive, P.O. Box 13089 Kanata
Ontario K2K 1X3 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Zarlink Semiconductor Inc.
350 Legget Drive, P.O. Box 13089
Kanata Ontario K2K 1X3 / CA
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Mitel Corporation
400 March Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3H4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / JIN, Gary, Qu
51 Liston Crescent
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2W3 / CA
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)McLean, Robert Andreas , et al
Dummett Copp LLP
25 The Square
Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]McLean, Robert Andreas , et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date00984733.618.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000CA01526
Priority number, dateGB1999003039923.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9930399
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0148939
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240761
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/03, H04L27/26
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:DATENZUWEISUNG BEI NICHT-PERFEKTER ENTZERRUNG IM ZEITBEREICH[2002/38]
English:DATA ALLOCATION WITH IMPERFECT TIME-DOMAIN EQUALISATION[2002/38]
French:AFFECTATION DE BITS A MULTITONALITE DISCRETE AVEC EGALISATION TEMPORELLE IMPARFAITE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2002National basic fee paid 
27.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/52]
21.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0918422  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] *;
 [X]  - AL-DHAHIR, CIOFFI, "Optimum finite-length equalization for multicarrier transceivers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (199601), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 56 - 64, XP000549644 [X] 1-8 * Section C *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.476097
 [X]  - AL-DHAHIR, CIOFFI, "A bandwidth-optimized reduced-complexity equalized multicarrier transceiver", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (199708), vol. 45, no. 8, pages 948 - 956, XP002172807 [X] 1-8 * page 948, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 949, column R, paragraph 5 - page 950, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.618299
 [X]  - MILISAVLJEVIC, VERRIEST, "Fixed point algorithm for bit rate optimal equalization in multicarrier systems", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, (19990315), pages 2515 - 2518 vol.5, XP002172808 [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - Network anc Customer Installation Interfaces - Asymmetric Digital Subscriber Line (ADSL) Metallic Interface, NEW YORK, US, ANSI, XP000955261 [X] 1-8 * Chapter 9;; figure 38 * * paragraph [9.4.10] * * paragraph [9.5.6] * * paragraph [9.6.6] *
 [A]  - KELLER, HANZ, "Sub-band adaptive pre-equalised OFDM transmission", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, New York, US, (19990919), pages 334 - 338, XP000929066 [A] 1-8 * abstract *