EP1266121 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING OIL PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerimov, Ikram Gadji Aga Ogly pr. Bjul-Bjulya, 14/-70, 1-2 Baku, 370000 / AZ | For all designated states Kerimov, Seymur Ikram Ogly pr. Bjul-Bjulya, 14/70, 1-2 Baku, 370000 / AZ | [2002/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Henrion, Oliver Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Henrion, Oliver Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Henrion, Oliver Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984939.9 | 22.11.2000 | [2002/51] | WO2000EA00008 | Priority number, date | NC200000097 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: EA 200000097 | [2005/46] |
Former [2002/51] | EA20000000097 | 14.03.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169038 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266121 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266121 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
E21B49/00 (EP);
E21B43/003 (EP);
G01V1/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | 08.10.2002 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 08.10.2002 | RO | 08.10.2002 | SI | 08.10.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GEWINNUNG VON ÖL | [2002/51] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVING OIL PRODUCTION | [2002/51] | French: | PROCEDES POUR AMELIORER LA PRODUCTION PETROLIERE | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 27.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.12.2005 | CH | 21.12.2005 | CY | 21.12.2005 | FI | 21.12.2005 | FR | 21.12.2005 | LI | 21.12.2005 | TR | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.03.2006 | GR | 21.03.2006 | SE | 21.03.2006 | ES | 01.04.2006 | PT | 22.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
TR | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | CH | 21.12.2005 | |
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 21.12.2005 | |
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 21.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5396955 (HOWLETT DONALD L [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 41 - line 55 * * column 2, line 51 - line 57 *; | [A]EP0676530 (N PROIZV BIOTEKHINVEST [RU]) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 15 *; | [A]US5826653 (RYNNE TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 7 - line 49 * | by applicant | RU2078913 | RU2105135 |