Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239974

EP1239974 - DEVICE FOR COATING A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/38]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COATING A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB
[2003/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bachofen + Meier AG Maschinenfabrik
An der Feldstrasse 60
CH-8180 Bülach / CH
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HOLTMANN, Bruno
Freilerstrasse 20
CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH
02 / MENA, José, Antonio
Friedlistrasse 1
CH-8180 Bülach / CH
03 / METZGER, Rolf
Im Bachofen 12
CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH
04 / FREDIANI, Luca
Berninastrasse 2
CH-8057 Zürich / CH
 [2002/45]
Former [2002/38]01 / HOLTMANN, Bruno
Freilerstrasse 20
CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH
02 / MENA, José, Antonio
Solistrasse 78
CH-8180 Bülach / CH
03 / METZGER, Rolf
Im Bachofen 12
CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH
04 / FREDIANI, Luca
Berninastrasse 2
CH-8057 Zürich / CH
Representative(s)Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/38]Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00985009.011.11.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000EP11170
Priority number, dateDE199916284423.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19962844
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0147643
Date:05.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239974
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239974
Date:22.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B05C5/00
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINER LAUFENDEN MATERIALBAHN[2003/09]
English:DEVICE FOR COATING A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB[2003/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REVETEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU CIRCULANTE[2003/09]
Former [2002/38]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINER LAUFENDEN MATERIALBAHN
Former [2002/38]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COATING A RUNNING MATERIAL WEB
Former [2002/38]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REVETEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU CIRCULANTE
Entry into regional phase20.04.2002National basic fee paid 
20.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
17.02.2006Fee for grant paid
17.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31]
Request for further processing for:10.02.2006Request for further processing filed
10.02.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.03.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
TR22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
LU11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/42]CY22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
TR22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
LU11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/37]CY22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
LU11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/33]CY22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/27]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/15]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
AT11.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/43]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/29]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/28]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/25]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/19]FI22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/09]NL22.08.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES03.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5908668  (BUELOW HANS-GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 5 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-5,9-12;
 [XA]GB1099127  (ARTOS MEIER WINDHORST KG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 20 - line 30 * * figure 2 * [A] 2-5,9-12;
 [XA]US5395660  (RUSCHAK KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A * * figure - * [A] 2,6-8;
 [XA]JPS6135880
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860627), vol. 010, no. 185, Database accession no. (C - 357), [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-5,9-12