Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237576

EP1237576 - ANTIVIRAL AGENT FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Gustave Roussy
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITE PARIS-SUD (PARIS XI)
15, rue Georges Clémenceau
91405 Orsay Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
INSTITUT GUSTAVE ROUSSY
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
F-94805 Villejuif Cédex / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITE PARIS-SUD (PARIS XI)
15, rue Georges Clémenceau
91405 Orsay Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOURHIS, Jean
12, rue JL Sinet
F-92330 Sceaux / FR
02 / ABDULKARIM, Bassam
22, avenue Jacques Jézéquel
F-92170 Vanves / FR
03 / DEUTSCH, Eric
7, rue Caron
F-75004 Paris / FR
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Gutmann, Ernest , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Gutmann, Ernest , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00985025.603.11.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000EP11246
Priority number, dateEP1999040274804.11.1999         Original published format: EP 99402748
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0132215
Date:10.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237576
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61K31/675
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIVIRALES MITTEL ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2002/37]
English:ANTIVIRAL AGENT FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF CANCER[2002/37]
French:AGENT ANTIVIRAL UTILE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2002National basic fee paid 
04.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
15.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/22]
02.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/22]
Request for further processing for:10.03.2005Request for further processing filed
10.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]  - NEYTS, JOHAN ET AL, "The antiviral agent cidofovir ((S)-1-(3-hydroxy-2-phosphonyl- methoxypropyl) cytosine) has pronounced activity against nasopharyngeal carcinoma grown in nude mice.", CANCER RESEARCH, (FEB. 1, 1998) VOL. 58, NO. 3, PP. 384-388., XP000882795 [X] 1-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - SNOECK, R. ET AL, "Effect of cidofovir on the tumor growth of SiHa (huma cervical carcinoma) cells in nude mice.", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1997) VOL. 34, NO. 2, PP. A69. MEETING INFO.: MEETING OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR ANTIVIRAL RESEARC AND THE TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH ATLANTA, GEORGIA, USA APRIL 6-11, 1997, XP000881870 [X] 1-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - DE CLERCQ, E. (1) ET AL, "Antitumor potential of acyclic nucleoside phosphonates.", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (APRIL-MAY, 1999) VOL. 18, NO. 4-5, PP. 759-771., XP000881894 [X] 1-29 * abstract *
 [X]  - JAMES E F REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE The Extra Pharmacopoeia, LONDON, GB, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY, (1996), XP002133250 [X] 1-10,14-16,18-24,26-29 * pages 651-652 *
 [X]  - JAMES E F REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE The Extra Pharmacopoeia, LONDON, GB, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY, (1996), XP002133251 [X] 1-10,14-16,18-24,26-29 * pages 664-667 *
 [X]  - JAMES E F REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE The Extra Pharmacopoeia, LONDON, GB, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY, (1996), XP002133252 [X] 1-10,14,15,17-24,26-29 * pages 653-657 *