Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235710

EP1235710 - MOUTH/NOSE FRESH AIR MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeiffer, Maria
Dr. Bolza-Ring 5
97299 Zell a. Main / DE
[2002/46]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Pfeiffer, Maria
Dr. Bolza-Ring 5
97299 Zell a. Main / DE
For all designated states
Klammes, Rolf
Kantstrasse 4
97209 Veitshöchheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pfeiffer, Maria
Dr. Bolza-Ring 5
97299 Zell / DE
02 / Klammes, Rolf
Kantstrasse 4
97209 Veitschöchheim / DE
 [2002/46]
Former [2002/36]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Leske, Thomas
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Leske, Thomas, Dr.
Frohwitter, Patent-u. Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00985115.529.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP11971
Priority number, dateDE199915749729.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19957497
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0140050
Date:07.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235710
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235710
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B63C11/14, A62B7/12, A61B18/02, A61M16/06
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MUND/NASE-FRISCHLUFT-MASKE[2002/36]
English:MOUTH/NOSE FRESH AIR MASK[2002/36]
French:MASQUE A AIR FRAIS POUR LA BOUCHE ET/OU LE NEZ[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2002National basic fee paid 
25.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
12.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2003Fee for grant paid
09.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI10.09.2003
FR10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
IT10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
TR10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2006/51]FI10.09.2003
FR10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
TR10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2006/14]FI10.09.2003
FR10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2005/01]FI10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/46]FI10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
ES21.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/45]FI10.09.2003
GB10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/41]FI10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/36]FI10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
CY29.11.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/31]FI10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
PT22.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI10.09.2003
IE10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/16]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI10.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1784487  (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH) [A] 1,4,12 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2875756  (EMILE GAGNAN) [A] 1,2,10,15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5404873  (LEAGRE MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,9,10 * figures 1,2B * * column 6, line 10 - line 36 * * column 7, line 32 - line 36 *;
 [A]FR2053375  (BARDEHLE HEINZ) [A] 1,2,4,10,11,15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]EP0467362  (EMS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2,5,6,8-10,14 * figures 1,2A * * column 6, line 9 - line 36 * * column 8, line 13 - line 30 * * column 9, line 13 - line 44 *;
 [A]WO9732619  (MEDISIZE BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,5,10 * figure 3 * * page 9, line 14 - line 30 *
by applicantEP0509016
 DE19727640
 DE19738266
 DE4023108