Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235574

EP1235574 - METHODS FOR MAKING SUSTAINED-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ERGOT ALKALOIDS HAVING IMPROVED BIOAVAILABILITY AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.01.2006  [2006/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POLICHEM S.A.
50 Val Fleuri
1526 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Polichem S.A.
50 Val Fleuri
1526 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / MAILLAND, Federico
Via San Marco, 24
I-20121 Milano / IT
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Dragotti, Gianfranco , et al
Dragotti & Associati Srl
Via Nino Bixio, 7
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]Dragotti, Gianfranco , et al
Dragotti & Associati srl, Galleria San Babila, 4/C
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/36]MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date00985142.930.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP12302
Priority number, dateUS1999045436403.12.1999         Original published format: US 454364
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0139742
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235574
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235574
Date:02.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/48, A61K9/20
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARZNEIZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON ERGOTALKALOIDHALTIGEN ARZNEIZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER WIRKSTOFFABGABE UND VERBESSERTER BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT[2002/36]
English:METHODS FOR MAKING SUSTAINED-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ERGOT ALKALOIDS HAVING IMPROVED BIOAVAILABILITY AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF[2002/36]
French:PROCEDES PERMETTANT LA PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A LIBERATION PROLONGEE D'ALCALOIDES D'ERGOT PRESENTANT UNE BIODISPONIBILITE AMELIOREE ET COMPOSITIONS AINSI OBTENUES[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2002National basic fee paid 
26.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
02.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2004Fee for grant paid
16.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04105405.7  / EP1512403
Opposition(s)03.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0284849  (LEK TOVARNA FARMACEVTSKIH [YU]) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,13,15,16 * claim - * * page 5, line 18 *;
 [X]EP0280613  (PF MEDICAMENT [FR]) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,13,15,16 * claim - * * example - *;
 [X]FR2327764  (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,13,15,16 * claim - * * example - *;
 [X]EP0875245  (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1,6,7,11,15,16 * claims 1,2,5,7-9,34 *;
 [AD]GB2170407  (SANDOZ LTD) [AD] 1-19 * claim - * * example - *;
 [A]JPS615010
 [A]  - 1, vol. 1986, no. 08, Database accession no. 1986-051909, XP002168552 [A] 1-19 * abstract *