Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240496

EP1240496 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING, BY DIFFRACTION, THE SIZE OF SUBSTANTIALLY SPHERICAL PARTICLES, IN PARTICULAR OPAQUE DROPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2007  [2007/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2006/44]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510
75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / De METZ, Jean
31, rue André Breton
F-91250 Saint Germain les Corbeil / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Brykman, Georges , et al
BREVALEX
95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Brykman, Georges , et al
c/o BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00985341.728.11.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000FR03318
Priority number, dateFR1999001499229.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914992
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0140766
Date:07.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240496
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/02
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2004/20]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DURCH BEUGUNG DER GRÖSSE VON IM WESENTLICHEN SPHÄRISCHEN TEILCHEN, INSBESONDERE UNDURCHSICHTIGEN TROPFEN[2002/38]
English:DEVICE FOR MEASURING, BY DIFFRACTION, THE SIZE OF SUBSTANTIALLY SPHERICAL PARTICLES, IN PARTICULAR OPAQUE DROPS[2002/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, PAR DIFFRACTION, DE TAILLES DE PARTICULES SENSIBLEMENT SPHERIQUES, NOTAMMENT DE GOUTTES OPAQUES[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2002National basic fee paid 
25.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
26.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/31]
14.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2044445  (COULTER ELECTRONICS) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0864853  (NIHON KOHDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4735504  (TYCKO DANIEL H [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4037965  (WEISS EDWARD LEONHARDT) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *