Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255756

EP1255756 - SACCHARIN DERIVATIVES AS ORALLY ACTIVE ELASTASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI-SYNTHELABO
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / ARANYI, Péter
Bimb(RTM) u. 216/226
H-1026 Budapest / HU
02 / BATORI, Sándor
Rák(RTM)czi F. u. 268/A
H-1214 Budapest II / HU
03 / DESSILLA, Stéphane
600, avenue Paul Demarne
F-34800 Canet / FR
04 / HERMECZ, István
Ráday u. 32
H-1092 Budapest / HU
05 / KAPUI, Zoltán
Etele u. 56/a
H-1115 Budapest / HU
06 / LEVAI, Ferenc
Cházár A. u. 19
H-1146 Budapest / HU
07 / MIKUS, Endre
Ida u. 96
H-1162 Budapest / HU
08 / PASCAL, Marc
La Muguette, Chemin de Montauriol
F-31280 Dremil-Lafage / FR
09 / T. NAGY, Lajos
István u. 47
H-1078 Budapest / HU
10 / SIMONOT, Bruno
29, rue de Mouettes
F-34750 Villeneuve les Maguelone / FR
11 / URBAN SZABO, Katalin
Szt. Lászl(RTM) u. 158
H-1131 Budapest / HU
12 / VARGA, Márton
Barátság u. 9
H-2120 Dunakeszi / HU
13 / VASVARINE DEBRECZY, Lelle
Goldmark K. u. 33
H-1122 Budapest / HU
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth , et al
Sanofi
Département Brevets
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth , et al
Sanofi-Synthélabo, Département Brevets, 174, avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00985705.314.12.2000
[2002/46]
WO2000HU00130
Priority number, dateHU1999000462417.12.1999         Original published format: HU 9904624
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0144245
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255756
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/505, A61P29/00, // (C07D471/04, 239:00), C07D221:00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesAL17.07.2002
LT17.07.2002
LV17.07.2002
MK17.07.2002
RO17.07.2002
SI17.07.2002
TitleGerman:SACCHARIN DERIVATE ALS ORAL WIRKSAME ELASTASE HEMMER[2002/46]
English:SACCHARIN DERIVATIVES AS ORALLY ACTIVE ELASTASE INHIBITORS[2002/46]
French:DERIVES DE SACCHARINE SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS D'ELASTASE ORALEMENT ACTIFS[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2002National basic fee paid 
17.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
31.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0626378  (STERLING WINTHROP INC [US]) [AD] 1-31 * page 43; example 9E *;
 [AD]  - HLASTA ET AL., "A novel class of cyclic beta-dicarbonyl ...", J.MED.CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 4687 - 4692, XP002164799 [AD] 1-31 * tables 2,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00023a008