Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1249348

EP1249348 - LINE-SCANNING TYPE INK JET RECORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Printing Systems, Ltd.
15-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/18]For all designated states
Ricoh Printing Systems, Ltd.
15-1, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Hitachi Printing Solutions Ltd.
810, Shimo-Imaizumi
Ebina-City Kanagawa-Pref. / JP
Former [2002/42]For all designated states
HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD.
15-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6020 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Takahiro
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Shinya
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
03 / KIDA, Hitoshi
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
04 / SATOU, Kunio
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
05 / OGAWA, Toshitaka
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
06 / MATSUMOTO, Yoshikane
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
07 / KAWASUMI, Katsunori
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
08 / SHIMIZU, Kazuo
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 1060, Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
 [2002/42]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven , et al
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]Howe, Steven , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2002/42]Howe, Steven
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00985995.028.12.2000
[2002/42]
WO2000JP09423
Priority number, dateJP1999037226528.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37226599
JP2000000071606.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000000716
[2002/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0147713
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1249348
Date:16.10.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1249348
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/01, B41J2/075, B41J2/095
[2003/13]
Former International [2002/42]B41J2/01
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2002/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER MIT ZEILENABTASTUNG[2002/42]
English:LINE-SCANNING TYPE INK JET RECORDER[2002/42]
French:IMPRIMANTE A JET D'ENCRE DE TYPE A BALAYAGE EN LIGNE[2002/42]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2002Translation filed 
19.07.2002National basic fee paid 
19.07.2002Search fee paid 
19.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
18.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2005Fee for grant paid
14.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4533925  (TSAO SHERMAN H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 60 - column 8, line 67; figure 3A * [A] 3,9-11;
 [XA]US4642653  (ITO TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 10 - line 34 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 2-6,8;
 [XA]EP0780230  (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 42 * * figure 2 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 56 * * claim 1 * [A] 4-10;
 [A]EP0293496  (HERTZ CARL H [SE]) [A] 1,2,4-10 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 34; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4424518  (SUZUKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 14 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,5 *;
 [XAY]US5049899  (DUNAND ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 8-10 * column 3, line 26 - line 46; figures 1,9 * [A] 1-7 [Y] 11;
 [XA]JPH05229125  ;
 [XA]US4905018  (REGNAULT LUC [FR]) [X] 8-10 * column 2, line 40 - column 56; figures 1,3A * * column 3, line 36 - line 60 * [A] 1-7;
 [Y]JPS55154172
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931214), vol. 017, no. 679, Database accession no. (M - 1527), [X] 8-10 * abstract * [A] 11
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810214), vol. 005, no. 025, Database accession no. (M - 055), [Y] 11 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH05229125  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH11170516  (BROTHER IND LTD);
 [A]EP0747220  (XEROX CORP [US]);
 [A]JPH0262243  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JPH0117865B