Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240285

EP1240285 - STABILISATION OF PIGMENTS AND POLYUNSATURATED OILS AND OIL CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pronova Biocare AS
Vollsveien 6
1366 Lysaker / NO
[2005/22]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Norsk Hydro ASA
0240 Oslo / NO
Inventor(s)01 / BREIVIK, Harald
Uranusveien 22
3942 Skjelsvik / NO
02 / SANNA, Lola, Irene
Borgasveien 10
3910 Porsgrunn / NO
03 / AANESEN, Berit, Annie
Nedre Kongerod 46
3737 Skien / NO
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00986089.120.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000NO00439
Priority number, dateNO1999000641122.12.1999         Original published format: NO 996411
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146355
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240285
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240285
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C11B5/00, A23D9/06, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A61K31/23
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABILISIERUNG VON PIGMENTEN UND MEHRFACH UNGESAETTIGTEN OELEN SOWIE OELKONZENTRATEN[2002/38]
English:STABILISATION OF PIGMENTS AND POLYUNSATURATED OILS AND OIL CONCENTRATES[2002/38]
French:STABILISATION DE PIGMENTS AINSI QUE D'HUILES POLYINSATUREES ET DE CONCENTRES D'HUILE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2002National basic fee paid 
20.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
19.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
26.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2005Fee for grant paid
15.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
TR08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
CY20.12.2005
IE20.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/09]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
TR08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
IE20.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/51]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
TR08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
IE20.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/48]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
IE20.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/40]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE08.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO0001249  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al);
 [X]WO8703899  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]);
 [X]WO9612415  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al);
 [A]EP0574974  (NORSK HYDRO TECHNOLOGY [NL]);
 [A]KR930005193B
 [A]  - S.J. KAUSHIK ET AL., "Utilization of dietary urea in rainbow trout", ANNALS OF NUTRITION & METABOLISM, (1983), vol. 27, pages 94 - 106, XP000866277
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 02, Database accession no. 1994-014007, XP002951455 & KR930005193B B1 19930616 (KIM D. ET AL.)