Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236371

EP1236371 - CHANNEL-TYPE SWITCHING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / MALMLÖF, Jim
Mittvägen 10
S-945 32 Norrfjärden / SE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Radio Networks
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/17]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/01]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan , et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2002/36]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Access
S-164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date00986145.108.12.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000SE02474
Priority number, dateUS1999045714108.12.1999         Original published format: US 457141
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0143485
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236371
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236371
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KANALTYP-UMSCHALTUNGSKONTROLLE[2007/11]
English:CHANNEL-TYPE SWITCHING CONTROL[2002/36]
French:COMMANDE DE COMMUTATION DU TYPE DE CANAL[2007/11]
Former [2002/36]KANALTYPE-SCHALTUNGSKONTROLLE
Former [2002/36]COMMANDE DE COMMUTATION DE TYPE DE CANAL
Entry into regional phase27.05.2002National basic fee paid 
27.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
10.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2007Fee for grant paid
20.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
LU08.12.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
PT02.01.2008
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]BE01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/48]BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/33]BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
MC31.12.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/23]BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
Former [2008/19]BE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0989765  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1,28 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 16 * * column 5, line 21 - line 36 *;
 [A]WO9952307  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-39 * page 28, line 26 - page 29, line 23 *;
 [A]WO9829975  (CELLPORT LABS INC [US]) [A] 1-39 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 16 * * page 2, line 33 - page 4, line 24 * * page 5, line 30 - line 35 * * page 6, line 10 - line 22 * * page 16, line 16 - line 30 * * page 17, line 34 - page 18, line 34 *