Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238574

EP1238574 - INTEGRATED CONVECTION AND CONDUCTION HEAT SINK FOR MULTIPLE MOUNTING POSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TEHAN, Matthew, A.
8701 Democracy Road NE
Albuquerque, NM 97109 / US
02 / LOSINSKI, Armand
12705 Calle Cereza N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US
03 / PARKINSON, Jay, Berkley
1637 Cliffside Drive
Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date00986314.311.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US33532
Priority number, dateUS1999046019613.12.1999         Original published format: US 460196
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0147333
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238574
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238574
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H05K7/14
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTER KONVEKTIVER UND WÄRMELEITENDER KÜHLKÖRPER FÜR MEHRERE MONTAGEPOSITIONEN[2002/37]
English:INTEGRATED CONVECTION AND CONDUCTION HEAT SINK FOR MULTIPLE MOUNTING POSITIONS[2002/37]
French:PUITS THERMIQUE INTEGRE DE CONVECTION ET DE CONDUCTION POUR EMPLACEMENTS DE MONTAGE MULTIPLES[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2002National basic fee paid 
18.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
28.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2003Fee for grant paid
19.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
IT14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
TR14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
IE11.12.2003
LU11.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2006/51]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
TR14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
IE11.12.2003
LU11.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2005/23]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
IE11.12.2003
LU11.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2005/03]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
IE11.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2005/02]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2004/36]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
CY11.12.2003
Former [2004/05]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
FI14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
Former [2004/03]AT14.05.2003
CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
Former [2004/02]CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
GR14.08.2003
PT14.08.2003
Former [2004/01]CH14.05.2003
LI14.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]US5930115  (TRACY MARK S [US], et al) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3467891  (MOGLE RODMAN A) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0824302  (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4819713  (WEISMAN ARNOLD M [US]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document *