Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237912

EP1237912 - FIVE-HELIX PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2008
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHITEHEAD INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH
Nine Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Root, Michael J.
10 Emerson Place, Apartment 12C
Boston, MA 02114 / US
02 / Kay, Michael S.
579 Sixth Avenue
Salt Lake City, Utah 84103 / US
03 / Chan, David C.
503 West Wistaria Av.
Arcadia, CA 91007 / US
04 / Kim, Peter S.
450 Boxwood Road, Bryn Mawr
Pennsylvania 19010 / US
 [2002/48]
Former [2002/47]01 / Root, Michael J.
10 Emerson Place, Apartment 12C
Boston, MA 02114 / US
02 / Kay, Michael S.
579 Sixth Avenue
Salt Lake City, Utah 84103 / US
03 / Chan, David C.
205 Kent Street 38
Brookline, MA 02446 / US
04 / Kim, Peter S.
48 Baskin Road
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
Former [2002/37]01 / Root, Michael J.
10 Emerson Place, Apartment 12C
Boston, MA 02114 / US
02 / Kay, Michael S.
884 Main Street, Apartment 3F
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / Chan, David C.
205 Kent Street 38
Brookline, MA 02446 / US
04 / Kim, Peter S.
48 Baskin Road
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
Representative(s)Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2002/37]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date00986475.215.12.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US34194
Priority number, dateUS19990171042P16.12.1999         Original published format: US 171042 P
US20000234572P22.09.2000         Original published format: US 234572 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0144286
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237912
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237912
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/16, C07K16/10, G01N33/50, A61K38/16
[2007/16]
Former International [2002/37]C07K14/16, C12N15/49, C07K16/10, G01N33/50, A61K38/16, A61P31/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:FUNF-HELIX PROTEIN[2002/37]
English:FIVE-HELIX PROTEIN[2002/37]
French:PROTEINE A CINQ HELICES[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2002National basic fee paid 
27.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
22.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CY12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
TR12.12.2007
LU15.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
GR13.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CY12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
LU15.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
GR13.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2009/33]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
CY12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
GR13.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2009/13]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
GR13.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/46]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
DK12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/42]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/40]AT12.12.2007
BE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/33]AT12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/27]FI12.12.2007
NL12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/25]FI12.12.2007
SE12.03.2008
Former [2008/23]SE12.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9640191  (TRIMERIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8-15,17-19,21,28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9832848  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1,5,8-15,17-19,21,28 * page 2, lines 10-15 * * page 26, line 5 - page 31, line 18 * * figure 5A; example 8 *;
 [PX]WO0040616  (WILD CARL T [US], et al) [PX] 1,5,8-15,17-22,28 * page 3, line 3 - page 8, line 30 * * page 30, line 24 - page 42, line 20; figure 7; examples 1-5 *;
 [E]WO0103723  (TRIMERIS INC [US], et al) [E] 1,5,8-15,17-19,23,24,26,28 * page 3, lines 3-24; examples 6,7 * * page 4, paragraphs 22-30 * * SEQ.ID.N. 1122; page 52 *
 [AD]  - D C CHAN ET AL, "Evidence that a prominent cavity in the coiled coil of HIV type 1 gp41 is an attractive drug target", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON,US, (199812), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15613 - 15617, XP002126805 [AD] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.26.15613
 [AD]  - ECKERT DEBRA M ET AL, "Inhibiting HIV-1 entry: Discovery of D-peptide inhibitors that target the gp41 coiled-coil pocket.", CELL, (19991001), vol. 99, no. 1, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 103 - 115, XP000982264 [AD] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80066-5
 [AD]  - WILD C T ET AL, "PEPTIDES CORRESPONDING TO A PREDICTIVE ALPHA-HELICAL DOMAIN OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRYS TYPE 1 GP41 ARE POTENT INHIBITORS OF VIRUS INFECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19941001), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9770 - 9774, XP002054040 [AD] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.21.9770
 [A]  - JIANG SHIBO ET AL, "A conformation-specific monoclonal antibody reacting with fusion-active gp41 from the human immunodeficiency virus type 1 envelope glycoprotein.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199812), vol. 72, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 10213 - 10217, XP002170629 [A] 1,8-15,17-22 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - CHAN DAVID C ET AL, "Core structure of gp41 from the HIV envelope glycoprotein.", CELL, (19970418), vol. 89, no. 2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 263 - 273, XP001002841 [DA] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * page 264, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80205-6
 [A]  - MALASHKEVICH VLADIMIR N ET AL, "Crystal structure of the simian immunodeficiency virus (SIV) gp41 core: Conserved helical interactions underlie the broad inhibitory activity of gp41 peptides.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, Aug. 4, 1998, (19980804), vol. 95, no. 16, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9134 - 9139, XP002170630 [A] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.16.9134
 [AD]  - WEISSENHORN W ET AL, "Atomic structure of the ectodomain from HIV-1 gp41.", NATURE (LONDON), (1997), vol. 387, no. 6631, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 426 - 430, XP001002849 [AD] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/387426a0
 [AD]  - TAN KEMIN ET AL, "Atomic structure of a thermostable subdomain of HIV-1 gp41.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, Nov. 11, 1997, (19971111), vol. 94, no. 23, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12303 - 12308, XP002170631 [AD] 1,8-15,17-19,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.23.12303
 [T]  - KLIGER YOSSEF ET AL, "Mode of action of an antiviral peptide from HIV-1: Inhibition at a post-lipid mixing stage.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010112), vol. 276, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1391 - 1397, XP001002840 [T] 1,8-15,17-19,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M004113200
 [T]  - COLE JAMES L ET AL, "Thermodynamics of peptide inhibitor binding to HIV-1 gp41.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20010515), vol. 40, no. 19, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5633 - 5641, XP002170633 [T] 1,8-15,17-19,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi010085w
 [T]  - ROOT MICHAEL J ET AL, "Protein design of an HIV-1 entry inhibitor.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (20010202), vol. 291, no. 5505, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 884 - 888, XP002170634 [T] 1-28

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1057453