blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1239776

EP1239776 - SURGICAL NEEDLE WITH WEEPING TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/38]SURGICAL NEEDLE WITH WEEPING TIP AND METHOD OF USE
[2006/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tricardia, L.L.C.
6420 Bayview Place Excelsior
Minnesota 55331 / US
[2007/09]
Former [2003/27]For all designated states
Tricardia, L.L.C.
6420 Bayview Place
Excelsior, Minnesota 55331 / US
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Tricardia, L.L.C.
6420 Bayview Place
Excelsior, Minnesota 55331 / US
For all designated states
Vantassel, Robert A.
6420 Bayview Place
Excelsior, MN 55331 / US
For all designated states
Holmes, David R., Jr.
1122-21st Street, N.E.
Rochester, MN 55906 / US
For all designated states
Schwartz, Robert S.
1123 Audaz Lane S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VANTASSEL, Robert, A.
6420 Bayview Place
Excelsior, MN 55331 / US
02 / HOLMES, David, R., Jr.
1122-21st Street, Northeast
Rochester, MN 55906 / US
03 / SCHWARTZ, Robert, S.
1123 Audaz Lane, Southwest
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2003/33]Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2002/38]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date00986533.818.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US34365
Priority number, dateUS1999046868820.12.1999         Original published format: US 468688
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0145548
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239776
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239776
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/00, A61M25/00
[2002/38]
CPC:
A61M5/3286 (EP,US); A61P43/00 (EP); A61M2025/0057 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0073 (EP,US); A61M25/0068 (EP,US); A61M5/3291 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE NADEL MIT AUSDIFFUNDIERENDER SPITZE[2006/25]
English:SURGICAL NEEDLE WITH WEEPING TIP[2006/25]
French:AIGUILLE HYPODERMIQUE MUNIE D'UNE POINTE POREUSE[2006/25]
Former [2002/38]CHIRURGISCHE NADEL MIT AUSDIFFUNDIERENDER SPITZE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGSMETHODE
Former [2002/38]SURGICAL NEEDLE WITH WEEPING TIP AND METHOD OF USE
Former [2002/38]AIGUILLE HYPODERMIQUE MUNIE D'UNE POINTE POREUSE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase14.06.2002National basic fee paid 
14.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
25.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2006Fee for grant paid
24.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
CY28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
TR28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/33]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
CY28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2008/52]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
FR28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2008/23]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
IT28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
FR19.10.2007
Former [2008/19]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
GR29.05.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
PT30.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
DK28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
NL28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
ES08.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
SE31.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH28.02.2007
FI28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI28.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9006150  (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1-18,46-54* the whole document *;
 [X]FR2747908  (CHOUT PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 46-52 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9904851  (EMED CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 6; figure - *;
 [X]WO9948545  (TRANSVASCULAR INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 20, line 16 - line 25; figure 5C *;
 [X]WO9949926  (CARDIOGENESIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 21, line 11 - line 21; figure 5 *;
 [PX]WO0029055  (MEHIER HENRI [FR]) [PX] 1-18,46-54 * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 13; figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS4405712
 US4650764
 US4870009
 US4952496
 WO9011092
 US5252479
 US5399346
 US5913856
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.