Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240314

EP1240314 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL RECOMBINANT PHYCOBILIPROTEIN-BASED FLUORESCENT CONSTRUCTS AND PHYCOBILISOME DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
5th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GLAZER, Alexander N. Uni. of California
Dept. Molecular and Cell Biology 230 Stanley Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720 / US
02 / CAI, Yuping
4679 Hazelwood Circle
Carmel, IN 46033 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Campbell, Patrick John Henry
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Campbell, Patrick John Henry
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date00986701.121.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US35028
Priority number, dateUS1999046919421.12.1999         Original published format: US 469194
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146395
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240314
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/00, C12N11/02, C12N11/16, C07K1/14, C07K14/415, A61K35/78
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONELLE REKOMBINANTE AUF PHYCOBILIPROTEIN BASIERENDE FLUORESZENTE KONSTRUKTE UND PHYCOBILISOMWIEDERGABE[2002/38]
English:MULTIFUNCTIONAL RECOMBINANT PHYCOBILIPROTEIN-BASED FLUORESCENT CONSTRUCTS AND PHYCOBILISOME DISPLAY[2002/38]
French:GENES CHIMERES FLUORESCENTS A BASE DE PHYCOBILIPROTEINE RECOMBINEE MULTIFONCTIONNELLE ET PRESENTATION DE PHYCOBILISOME[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2002National basic fee paid 
19.06.2002Search fee paid 
19.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
28.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/52]
08.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9823737  (UNIV AMSTERDAM [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11-13,15-19 * the whole document *;
 CN1157324  [ ] (INST OCEANOLOGY CHINESE ACAD [CN]);
 [X]US5055556  (STRYER LUBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,15-19 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO0196871  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]  QIN, SONG ET AL, "Recombinant preparation of phycobiliproteins of Anacystis nidulans as a fusion protein with maltose-binding protein", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 132:19595 HCA, URL: STN, XP002225873 [X] 1-5,11-13,15-18 * abstract *
 [X]  MOZLEY DAVID ET AL, "Large-scale generation of affinity-purified recombinant phytochrome chromopeptide.", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (199711), vol. 66, no. 5, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 710 - 715, XP009002342 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1997.tb03211.x
 [X]  CHERRY RICHARD J ET AL, "Detection of dimers of dimers of human leukocyte antigen (HLA)-DR on the surface of living cells by single-particle fluorescence imaging", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (19980112), vol. 140, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 71 - 79, XP002185514 [X] 15-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.140.1.71
 [T]  CAI YUPING A ET AL, "Recombinant C-phycocyanins equipped with affinity tags, oligomerization, and biospecific recognition domains", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20010315), vol. 290, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 186 - 204, XP002185513 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2000.4979
 [T]  TOOLEY A J ET AL, "BIOSYNTHESIS OF THE CYANOBACTERIAL LIGHT-HARVESTING POLYPEPTIDE PHYCOERYTHROCYANIN HOLO-ALPHA SUBUNIT IN A HETEROLOGOUS HOST", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (200209), vol. 184, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4666 - 4671, XP009002304 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.184.17.4666-4671.2002
International search[A]US5912137  (TSIEN ROGER Y [US], et al)
 [A]  - CAI ET AL., "Transposon insertion in genes coding for the biosynthesis of structural components of the Anabaena sp. phycobilisome", PHOTOSYNTHESIS RESEARCH, (199709), vol. 53, no. 2-3, pages 109 - 120, XP002938319

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005816906539
 [A]  - CRAMERI ET AL., "PJuFo: A phagemid for display of cDNA libraries on phage surface suitable for selective isolation of clones expressing allergens", ADV. EXP. MED. BIOL., (1996), vol. 409, pages 103 - 110, XP002938318