Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242001

EP1242001 - STRIP-LIKE IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon GmbH
Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
22851 Norderstedt / DE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SUMP, Raimo
Siedlung 3
19057 Schwerin / DE
02 / WALTHER, Christoph
Dorfstrasse 35
24568 Kattendorf / DE
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Both, Georg
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00987380.311.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000EP12491
Priority number, dateDE199916408129.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19964081
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0149095
Date:12.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1242001
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242001
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STREIFENFÖRMIGES IMPLANTAT[2002/39]
English:STRIP-LIKE IMPLANT[2002/39]
French:IMPLANT DE TYPE BANDE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2002National basic fee paid 
25.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2006Fee for grant paid
27.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04017739.6  / EP1477121
Opposition(s)29.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US5922026  (CHIN ALBERT K [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]WO9417747  (MEDPROD INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [XY]US5997565  (INOUE MASAHIDE [JP]) [X] 9,10,13,14 * column 4, line 58 - line 65; figure 8 * [Y] 11,12;
 [Y]US5968051  (LUCKMAN THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 3, line 25 - line 29; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5788625  (PLOUHAR PAMELA L [US], et al) [X] 9,10,13,14 * figure 2 *