Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1261679

EP1261679 - SUPERTWISTED NEMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS, LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITIONS AND COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2008  [2008/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / IONESCU, Doina
34B, Oakmount Avenue
Southampton, Hampshire SO17 1ED / GB
02 / FRANCIS, Matthew
67 St Denys Road
Southampton, Hampshire SO17 2FN / GB
03 / COATES, David
87 Sopwith Crescent, Merley, Wimborne
Dorset BH21 1SW / GB
 [2002/49]
Application number, filing date00987402.514.12.2000
[2002/49]
WO2000EP12732
Priority number, dateEP2000010408028.02.2000         Original published format: EP 00104080
DE200010923428.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10009234
[2002/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164814
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1261679
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/42, C09K19/46, C09K19/04, C09K19/34, C07D319/06, C07D239/26, C07D333/04, C07D333/78
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUPERTWIST-NEMATISCH FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEN ,FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN-UND VERBINDUNGEN[2002/49]
English:SUPERTWISTED NEMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS, LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITIONS AND COMPOUNDS[2002/49]
French:AFFICHAGES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES NEMATIQUES EN HELICE, COMPOSITIONS ET COMPOSES DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES[2002/49]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2002National basic fee paid 
01.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
08.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/51]
04.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YP]EP1002848  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YP] 1,2,4-8,10-12 * claims 1-10 *;
 [YX]GB2322631  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 1 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 7 - page 14, line 14 * * page 32, line 1 - page 33, line 24 * [X] 13;
 [Y]GB2327682  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * page 5, line 7 - page 11, line 7; claims 1-13 *;
 [YPX]DE10018598  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YP] 1-5 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 51 * * page 5, line 20 - line 45 * [X] 13;
 [YX]DE19746793  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, line 37 - page 6, line 50; claims 1-6 * [X] 13;
 [YX]WO9623851  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,10-12 * page 23, line 30; example 27; claims 1-13 * [X] 13;
 [XD]EP0390329  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XD] 13 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0447565  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 13 * claim 2 *;
 [D]WO9105780  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP])