Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235480

EP1235480 - A PROCESS FOR CONVERTING STORAGE RESERVES OF DICOT SEEDS INTO COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ONE OR MORE GENE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicrop Ltd.
Helsinki Science Park, Viikinkaari 6
00710 Helsinki / FI
[2007/17]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Unicrop Ltd.
Helsinki Science Park, Viikinkaari 6
00710 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KUVSHINOV, Viktor
Kurpolku 1D 17
FIN-01280 Vantaa / FI
02 / KANERVA, Anne
Sammatintie 6 L 124
FIN-00550 Helsinki / FI
03 / KOIVU, Kimmo
Sammatintie 6 L 124
FIN-00550 Helsinki / FI
04 / PEHU, Eija
Mechelininkatu 25 A 7
FIN-00100 Helsinki / FI
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina , et al
Borenius & Co Oy AB
Tallberginkatu 2 A
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina , et al
Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00987501.408.12.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000FI01081
Priority number, dateFI1999000265910.12.1999         Original published format: FI 992659
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0141559
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235480
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235480
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/10, C12N15/82
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesAL01.06.2002
LT01.06.2002
LV01.06.2002
MK01.06.2002
RO01.06.2002
SI01.06.2002
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR UMFORMUNG VON RESERVESTOFFEN AUS ZWEIKEIMBLÄTTRIGEN PFLANZENSAMEN IN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN GENPRODUKTEN[2002/36]
English:A PROCESS FOR CONVERTING STORAGE RESERVES OF DICOT SEEDS INTO COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ONE OR MORE GENE PRODUCTS[2002/36]
French:PROCESSUS DE TRANSFORMATION DE RESERVES DE STOCKAGE DE GRAINES DE DICOTYLEDONE EN COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN OU PLUSIEURS PRODUITS GENIQUES[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2002National basic fee paid 
01.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
01.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
08.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2007Fee for grant paid
09.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07106801.9  / EP1857557
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
CY25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
TR25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
GB08.12.2007
LU08.12.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
CY25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
GB08.12.2007
LU08.12.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2009/33]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
CY25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
GB08.12.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2009/03]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
GB08.12.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/52]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
IE10.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/48]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
IE10.12.2007
FR21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/33]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
FR21.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/23]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
IT25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
DE26.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
FR21.12.2007
Former [2008/19]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/09]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/08]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2007/48]CH25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2007/47]ES05.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9732986  (WEISSHEIMER FRIEDR MALZFAB [DE], et al);
 [X]WO9411519  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al);
 [X]US5994628  (RODRIGUEZ RAYMOND L [US]);
 [X]US5608143  (HERSHEY HOWARD P [US], et al)