Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254571

EP1254571 - A MESSAGING SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.12.2006  [2006/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / AHO, Outi
Kuulatie 4 A
FIN-37500 Lempäälä / FI
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri
Espatent Oy
Kaivokatu 10 D
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2006/27]Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri
Espatent Oy Tekniikantie 14
02150 Espoo / FI
Former [2004/02]Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri
Forssén & Salomaa Oy Eerikinkatu 2
00100 Helsinki / FI
Former [2002/45]Stellberg, Hans , et al
Forssén & Salomaa Oy Eerikinkatu 2
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00987530.318.12.2000
[2002/45]
WO2000FI01110
Priority number, dateFI1999000278223.12.1999         Original published format: FI 992782
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0149047
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254571
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/22
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHRICHTENDIENST[2002/45]
English:A MESSAGING SERVICE[2002/45]
French:SERVICE DE MESSAGERIE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2002National basic fee paid 
05.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
01.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/51]
04.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PY]WO0056088  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [PY] 1-19 * page 2, line 10 - page 5, line 30 * * abstract *;
 [PY]WO0064203  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [PY] 1-19 * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 31 * * abstract *;
 [PY]WO9966746  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [PY] 1-19 * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 9 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO9819438  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 10 - page 7, line 13 * * abstract *
 [X]  - SEVANTO J, "Multimedia Messaging Service for GPRS and UMTS", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, IEEE WCNC1999, nokia telecommun. finland, (19990921), pages 1422 - 1426, XP002901764 [X] 1-19 * page 1424, column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 2 * * page 1424, column 2, line 19 - page 1425, column 1, line 35 * * abstract *