Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240286

EP1240286 - FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITIONS AND COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For:CY  GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Grainger, David Stephen
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
02 / Conroy, James, Patrick
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
03 / Creeth, Andrew, Martin
Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2002/38]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date00987563.415.12.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000GB04824
Priority number, dateGB1999003043722.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9930437
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146359
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240286
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/66, C11D3/22, C11D1/835, C07H13/06, C07H15/04
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEXTILWEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -VERBINDUNGEN[2002/38]
English:FABRIC SOFTENING COMPOSITIONS AND COMPOUNDS[2002/38]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET COMPOSES ADOUCISSANTS POUR TISSUS[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2002National basic fee paid 
10.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9816538  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,4-11 * page 4, lines 14-23 * * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 9 * * page 9, line 18 - page 13, line 14 * * example 53; claims 1-11,14 *;
 [DA]WO9615213  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [DA] 1,5-11 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * examples A1-A7 *;
 [A]EP0325184  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,5,9-11 * page 4, line 45 - page 6, line 40 * * page 7, line 45 - page 8, line 35 * * example 1 *;
 [A]GB1264337  (THE GILLETTE CO) [A] 1,5-11 * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 16 * * examples 1-7; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0311154  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [D]AU1441688  (PROCTER & GAMBLE);
 [PAD]WO0070005  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PAD] 1,4-6,9-11 * examples 5,6; claims 1-7 *