Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243928

EP1243928 - MEANS OF STABILIZING COMPOSITIONS AND REAGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.02.2009  [2009/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
[2006/15]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL REAGENTS CORPORATION
1-30, Hamabe-dori 2-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0083 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKUDA, Masahiro, Int. Reagents Corp. Res. Dev. Ct
1-2, Murotani 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2241 / JP
02 / HIURA, Hisahide, Int. Reagents Corp. Dev. Ctr.
1-2, Murotani 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2241 / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00987709.322.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000JP09131
Priority number, dateJP1999036666324.12.1999         Original published format: JP 36666399
[2002/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0148486
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243928
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/86, G01N33/48, C07K14/745
[2007/50]
Former International [2002/39]G01N33/86, G01N33/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABILISIERUNG VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND REAGENZIEN[2002/39]
English:MEANS OF STABILIZING COMPOSITIONS AND REAGENTS[2002/39]
French:MOYEN DE STABILISATION DE COMPOSITIONS ET REACTIFS[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2002Translation filed 
21.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.06.2002Search fee paid 
21.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
21.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
08.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.12.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0665435  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * examples 2,4 *;
 [X]  SIEBENLIST K R ET AL, "Evidence of intramolecular cross-linked A alpha.gamma chain heterodimers in plasma fibrinogen.", BIOCHEMISTRY 7 MAY 1996, (19960507), vol. 35, no. 18, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5817 - 5821, XP002457576 [X] 1-6 * page 5817, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi952264h
 [Y]  BLOMBACK B ET AL, "FACTOR-XIII INDUCED GELATION OF HUMAN FIBRINOGEN AN ALTERNATIVE THIOL ENHANCED THROMBIN INDEPENDENT PATHWAY", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1985), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 613 - 628, XP002457577 [Y] 1-6 * page 615 - page 617; figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0049-3848(85)90094-5
 [Y]  KANAIDE H ET AL, "Cross linking of fibrinogen and fibrin by fibrin stabilizing factor (factor XIIIa)", JOURNAL OF LABORATORY AND CLINICAL MEDICINE 1975, (1975), vol. 85, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2143, pages 574 - 597, XP009091662 [Y] 1-6 * page 575 - page 576 *
 [A]  SCHWARTZ M L ET AL, "HUMAN FACTOR XIII FROM PLASMA AND PLATELETS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC.,, US, (19730225), vol. 248, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1395 - 1407, XP000944361 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - CATANI MARIA VALERIA ET AL., "Inhibition of clotting factor XIII activity by nitric oxide", DATABASE BIOSIS PREVIEWS(R), Database accession no. 199800400895, XP002937358
    [] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 249, no. 1, pages 275 - 278,
 [A]  - COYNE C.P., SMITH J.E., DEBOWES R.M., "Pharmacologic evaluation of factor XIIIA-like enzyme activity in equine plasma as a potential therapeutic avenue for the inhibition of fibrinous tissue", DATABASE BIOSIS PREVIEWS(R), Database accession no. 000094031787, XP002937359
    [] - AMERICAN J. VETERINARY RES., (1992), vol. 53, no. 5, pages 695 - 705,