Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162679

EP1162679 - POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2007  [2007/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UKAI, Kunihiro
2-207-1-B12, Higashiikoma
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0213 / JP
02 / TOMIZAWA, Takeshi
12-12, Mayumiminami 1-chome
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0123 / JP
03 / TAGUCHI, Kiyoshi
4-11-4-102, Yokozutsumi, Tsurumi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0052 / JP
04 / SHONO, Toshiyuki
7-26-6-1, Hikaridai
Seikacho, Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
05 / KITAGAWA, Koichiro
Shosei-ryo, 2-13-1, Tsujido-Higashikaigan
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0045 / JP
06 / ASOU, Tomonori
5-21, Umamikita 9-chome
Koryocho, Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 635-08 / JP
07 / OZEKI, Masataka
5-21-1-304, Fuchucho
Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-0071 / JP
08 / MIYAUCHI, Shinji
607-3, Yao
Tawaramotocho, Shiki-gun, Nara 636-0311 / JP
09 / MAENISHI, Akira
Room K703 1-28, Kamishinden
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 565-0085 / JP
10 / YOSHIDA, Yutaka
1-308, Umegaokakita
Nabari-shi, Mie 518-0746 / JP
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/50]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00987776.227.12.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000JP09363
Priority number, dateJP1999037385628.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37385699
JP1999037385728.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37385799
JP1999037385928.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37385999
JP2000000550214.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000005502
JP2000013996612.05.2000         Original published format: JP 2000139966
[2001/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0148851
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162679
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, H01M8/10, C01B3/32, C01B3/38
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSEINHEIT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN[2001/50]
English:POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREFOR[2001/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2001Translation filed 
20.08.2001National basic fee paid 
20.08.2001Search fee paid 
20.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
24.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/47]
06.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19823499  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 50 - line 64; figure 1 * * page 4, line 5 - line 10 * * page 4, line 50 - line 60 *;
 [Y]JPH10330101  ;
 [A]EP0184970  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 8, line 14 - line 23; figure 1 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [Y] 1-7 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS57212779  (KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al);
 [Y]JPH11149931  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPS6391165U  ;
 [A]JPH11250927  (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH08119602  (AQUEOUS RES KK)